Johannsongs-Publishing, Ltd. v. Rolf Lovland, et al
Defendant / Appellee: ROLF LOVLAND, DOES, 1-20, UMG RECORDINGS, INC., PEERMUSIC LTD., BRENDAN GRAHAM, UNIVERSAL-POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHING, INC. and WARNER BROS. RECORDS, INC.
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOHANNSONGS-PUBLISHING, LTD.
Case Number: 20-55552
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 07/29/2020, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant Johannsongs-Publishing, Ltd. opening brief due 09/25/2020. Appellees Does, Brendan Graham, Rolf Lovland, Peermusic Ltd., UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc. and Warner Bros. Records, Inc. answering brief due 10/26/2020. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [11736813] (CL) [Entered: 06/29/2020 02:56 PM]
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 06/23/2020, 1:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11717111] (CL) [Entered: 06/10/2020 09:43 AM]
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/04/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11711856]. [20-55552] (AD) [Entered: 06/04/2020 06:44 PM]
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Johannsongs-Publishing, Ltd. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/04/2020. [11711653] [20-55552] (Machat, Michael) [Entered: 06/04/2020 04:20 PM]
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11711433] (LW) [Entered: 06/04/2020 02:56 PM]
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Johannsongs-Publishing, Ltd. Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/02/2020. Transcript ordered by 06/17/2020. Transcript due 07/17/2020. Appellant Johannsongs-Publishing, Ltd. opening brief due 08/26/2020. Appellees Does, Brendan Graham, Rolf Lovland, Peermusic Ltd., UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc. and Warner Bros. Records, Inc. answering brief due 09/25/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11700278] (JBS) [Entered: 05/26/2020 09:22 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Johannsongs-Publishing, Ltd. v. Rolf Lovland, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROLF LOVLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES, 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UMG RECORDINGS, INC.
Represented By: Barry Slotnick
Represented By: Ava Badiee
Represented By: Tal Dickstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PEERMUSIC LTD.
Represented By: Barry Slotnick
Represented By: Ava Badiee
Represented By: Tal Dickstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRENDAN GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNIVERSAL-POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHING, INC.
Represented By: Barry Slotnick
Represented By: Ava Badiee
Represented By: Tal Dickstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WARNER BROS. RECORDS, INC.
Represented By: Barry Slotnick
Represented By: Ava Badiee
Represented By: Tal Dickstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHANNSONGS-PUBLISHING, LTD.
Represented By: Michael Machat Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?