Ahmad Aljindi v. USA, et al
Defendant / Appellee: CHAD F. WOLF, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security, PAUL M. NAKASONE, Department of Defense, National Security Agency, WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, MEGAN J. BRENNAN, Postmaster General, United States Postal Service, JOVITA CARRANZA, Administrator, United States Small Business Administration, ROBERT WILKIE, Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs, JIM BRIDENSTINE, Administrator, National Aeronautics and Space Administration, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, BARBARA M. BARRETT, Secretary, Department of the Air Force, MARK T. ESPER, United States Secretary of Defense, JAMES E. MCPHERSON, Secretary, Department of The Navy and RICHARD A. GRENELL, Acting Director of National Intelligence, Office of The Director of National Intelligence
Plaintiff / Appellant: AHMAD JAMALEDDIN ALJINDI
Case Number: 20-55688
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Ahmad Jamaleddin Aljindi EMERGENCY Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion to Reopen Case & Emergency Motion Under Circuit Rule 27-3]. Date of service: 08/21/2020. [11798970] [20-55688] (Aljindi, Ahmad) [Entered: 08/21/2020 07:27 PM]
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [11790608] (NAC) [Entered: 08/17/2020 07:59 AM]
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 Filed order (SIDNEY R. THOMAS, MARY M. SCHROEDER and CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the orders challenged in the appeal are not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; United States v. Washington, 573 F.2d 1121, 1122 (9th Cir. 1978) (order denying motion to disqualify judge is not final or appealable); see also Branson v. City of Los Angeles, 912 F.2d 334, 336 (9th Cir. 1990) (denial of reconsideration of non-appealable order is itself not appealable). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. DISMISSED. [11763562] (JPD) [Entered: 07/23/2020 11:57 AM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Ahmad Jamaleddin Aljindi opening brief due 09/09/2020. Appellees William P. Barr, Attorney General, Barbara M. Barrett, Megan J. Brennan, Jim Bridenstine, Jovita Carranza, Mark T. Esper, Richard A. Grenell, James E. McPherson, Paul M. Nakasone, United States of America, Robert Wilkie and Chad F. Wolf answering brief due 10/09/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11745566] (RT) [Entered: 07/08/2020 09:34 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ahmad Aljindi v. USA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHAD F. WOLF, Acting Secretary of Homeland Security
Represented By: Alarice M. Medrano Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL M. NAKASONE, Department of Defense, National Security Agency
Represented By: Alarice M. Medrano Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Represented By: Alarice M. Medrano Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MEGAN J. BRENNAN, Postmaster General, United States Postal Service
Represented By: Alarice M. Medrano Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOVITA CARRANZA, Administrator, United States Small Business Administration
Represented By: Alarice M. Medrano Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT WILKIE, Secretary, Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: Alarice M. Medrano Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JIM BRIDENSTINE, Administrator, National Aeronautics and Space Administration
Represented By: Alarice M. Medrano Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Alarice M. Medrano Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BARBARA M. BARRETT, Secretary, Department of the Air Force
Represented By: Alarice M. Medrano Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK T. ESPER, United States Secretary of Defense
Represented By: Alarice M. Medrano Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES E. MCPHERSON, Secretary, Department of The Navy
Represented By: Alarice M. Medrano Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD A. GRENELL, Acting Director of National Intelligence, Office of The Director of National Intelligence
Represented By: Alarice M. Medrano Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AHMAD JAMALEDDIN ALJINDI
Represented By: Ahmad Jamaleddin Aljindi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?