Marcie Le, et al v. Walgreen Co, et al
Defendant / Appellee: WALGREEN CO, an Illinois corporation, WALGREEN PHARMACY SERVICES MIDWEST, LLC, an Illinois limited liability company and WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC., a Delaware corporation
Plaintiff / Appellant: KAREN DAO, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated and MARCIE LE
Case Number: 20-55743
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 Streamlined request [9] by Appellants Karen Dao and Marcie Le to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants Karen Dao and Marcie Le opening brief due 10/26/2020. Appellees Walgreen Co, Walgreen Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. answering brief due 11/25/2020. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11812781] (BG) [Entered: 09/03/2020 03:39 PM]
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Karen Dao and Marcie Le. New requested due date is 10/26/2020. [11812604] [20-55743] (Chan, Lin) [Entered: 09/03/2020 02:29 PM]
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 11789880-2 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) UNDER SEAL Appellees Walgreen Co, Walgreen Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. motion to maintain document under seal. Date of service: 08/11/2020. [11785404] [20-55743] (Eckstrom, Allison) [Entered: 08/11/2020 03:14 PM]
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 08/13/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11772002] (BLS) [Entered: 07/30/2020 01:13 PM]
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellees Walgreen Co, Walgreen Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/29/2020. [11771353] [20-55743] (Lo, Karina) [Entered: 07/29/2020 07:16 PM]
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 07/29/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11771339]. [20-55743] (AD) [Entered: 07/29/2020 06:44 PM]
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellants Marcie Le and Karen Dao Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 07/29/2020. [11771199] [20-55743] (Hutchinson, Daniel) [Entered: 07/29/2020 04:44 PM]
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 07/23/2020. [11763262] (BY) [Entered: 07/23/2020 10:18 AM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Karen Dao and Marcie Le Mediation Questionnaire due on 07/29/2020. Appellants Karen Dao and Marcie Le opening brief due 09/24/2020. Appellees Walgreen Co, Walgreen Pharmacy Services Midwest, LLC and Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. answering brief due 10/26/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11762526] (RT) [Entered: 07/22/2020 03:34 PM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 Filed order (MARY M. SCHROEDER and CONSUELO M. CALLAHAN, Circuit Judges) in case no. 20-80101 on July 22, 2020: Petitioners motion for leave to file a reply in support of the petition for permission to appeal (Docket Entry No. 6) is granted. The reply has been filed. The court, in its discretion, grants the petition for permission to appeal the district courts April 27, 2020 order denying class action certification. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(f); Chamberlan v. Ford Motor Co., 402 F.3d 952 (9th Cir. 2005) (stating standard). Within 14 days after the date of this order, petitioners shall perfect the appeal in accordance with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 5(d). The motions to maintain portions of the petition, answer, and exhibits under seal (Docket Entry Nos. 2 and 4) are denied without prejudice to any party, within 21 days after the date of this order, filing a renewed motion to seal that complies with Ninth Circuit Rule 27-13. Any motion to seal should not be based on the fact that the material at issue was filed under seal in the district court pursuant to the stipulation of the parties. See 9th Cir. R. 27-13(a), (e). A motion to seal must explain the specific reasons for th[e] relief and describe the potential for irreparable injury in the absence of such relief and also request the least restrictive scope of sealing and be limited in scope to only the specific documents or portion of documents that merit sealing. 9th Cir. R. 27-13(e). The Clerk shall maintain the petition and supporting exhibits and the answer and supporting exhibits provisionally under seal until the expiration of the 21-day period, or until the disposition of any timely-filed renewed motion to seal. If no such motion is filed, the Clerk shall file the materials publicly. [11762519] (RT) [Entered: 07/22/2020 03:32 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Marcie Le, et al v. Walgreen Co, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WALGREEN CO, an Illinois corporation
Represented By: Christopher John Archibald Esquire
Represented By: Allison Eckstrom
Represented By: Karina Lo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WALGREEN PHARMACY SERVICES MIDWEST, LLC, an Illinois limited liability company
Represented By: Christopher John Archibald Esquire
Represented By: Allison Eckstrom
Represented By: Karina Lo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Christopher John Archibald Esquire
Represented By: Allison Eckstrom
Represented By: Karina Lo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KAREN DAO, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Daniel Morris Hutchinson
Represented By: Lin Yee Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARCIE LE
Represented By: Daniel Morris Hutchinson
Represented By: Lin Yee Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?