Johannsongs-Publishing, Ltd. v. Peermusic Ltd., et al
Defendant: DOES, 1-20, BRENDAN GRAHAM, SPOTIFY TECHNOLOGY S.A., APPLE INC. and ROLF LOVLAND
Plaintiff / Appellee: JOHANNSONGS-PUBLISHING, LTD.
Defendant / Appellant: POLYGRAM PUBLISHING, INC., successor to Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc. and incorrectly sued as Universal Music Publishing Group, WARNER RECORDS INC., incorrectly sued as Warner Music Group, PEERMUSIC LTD. and UMG RECORDINGS, INC.
Case Number: 20-55759
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SSR): Defendants motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 11819231-0 ]) to consolidate is granted. Nos. 20-55552 and 20-55759 are consolidated. The following cross-appeal-style briefing schedule will govern these consolidated appeals: Plaintiffs first brief on cross-appeal (opening brief in No. 20-55552) is due October 26, 2020. Defendants second brief on cross-appeal (combined answering brief in No. 20-55552 and opening brief in No. 20-55759) is due November 25, 2020. Plaintiffs third brief on cross-appeal (combined reply brief in No. 20-55552 and answering brief in No. 20-55759) is due December 28, 2020. Defendants optional reply brief in No. 20-55759 is due within 21 days after plaintiffs third brief on cross-appeal. In view of the complexity of this briefing schedule, no streamlined extensions of time will be approved. [11836237] [20-55552, 20-55759] (OC) [Entered: 09/24/2020 04:18 PM]
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellants Peermusic Ltd., Polygram Publishing, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc. and Warner Records Inc. Motion to consolidate cases 20-55759 and 20-55552. Date of service: 09/10/2020. [11819219] [20-55759] (Badiee, Ava) [Entered: 09/10/2020 01:55 PM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference (w/ 20-55552), 08/27/2020, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11797340] (CL) [Entered: 08/20/2020 06:08 PM]
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 08/04/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11776821]. [20-55759] (AD) [Entered: 08/04/2020 12:44 PM]
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Peermusic Ltd., Polygram Publishing, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc. and Warner Records Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 08/04/2020. [11776751] [20-55759] (Badiee, Ava) [Entered: 08/04/2020 12:12 PM]
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Peermusic Ltd., Polygram Publishing, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc. and Warner Records Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 08/04/2020. Transcript ordered by 08/27/2020. Transcript due 09/28/2020. Appellants Peermusic Ltd., Polygram Publishing, Inc., UMG Recordings, Inc. and Warner Records Inc. opening brief due 11/05/2020. Appellee Johannsongs-Publishing, Ltd. answering brief due 12/07/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11769981] (JPD) [Entered: 07/28/2020 05:14 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Johannsongs-Publishing, Ltd. v. Peermusic Ltd., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES, 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENDAN GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPOTIFY TECHNOLOGY S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROLF LOVLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHANNSONGS-PUBLISHING, LTD.
Represented By: Michael Machat Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: POLYGRAM PUBLISHING, INC., successor to Universal-Polygram International Publishing, Inc. and incorrectly sued as Universal Music Publishing Group
Represented By: Barry Slotnick
Represented By: Ava Badiee
Represented By: Tal Dickstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WARNER RECORDS INC., incorrectly sued as Warner Music Group
Represented By: Barry Slotnick
Represented By: Ava Badiee
Represented By: Tal Dickstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PEERMUSIC LTD.
Represented By: Barry Slotnick
Represented By: Ava Badiee
Represented By: Tal Dickstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UMG RECORDINGS, INC.
Represented By: Barry Slotnick
Represented By: Ava Badiee
Represented By: Tal Dickstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?