Amanda Hill, et al v. Quicken Loans, LLC
Plaintiff: GAYLE HYDE
Plaintiff / Appellee: AMANDA HILL, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Defendant / Appellant: QUICKEN LOANS, LLC, FKA Quicken Loans Inc.
Case Number: 20-55924
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11847312] (VS) [Entered: 10/05/2020 11:51 AM]
September 21, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 10/05/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11830672] (VS) [Entered: 09/21/2020 11:30 AM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/11/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11821492]. [20-55924] (AD) [Entered: 09/11/2020 06:44 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Quicken Loans, LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/11/2020. [11820926] [20-55924] (Brown, Brooks) [Entered: 09/11/2020 02:29 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 Added Attorney(s) William M. Jay for party(s) Appellant Quicken Loans, LLC, in case 20-55924. [11820903] (RR) [Entered: 09/11/2020 02:21 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of William M. Jay (Goodwin Procter LLP, 1900 N Street, N.W. Washington, D.C. 20036) for Appellant Quicken Loans, LLC. Date of service: 09/11/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11820867] [20-55924] (Jay, William) [Entered: 09/11/2020 02:11 PM]
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Quicken Loans, LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/11/2020. Transcript ordered by 10/05/2020. Transcript due 11/02/2020. Appellant Quicken Loans, LLC opening brief due 12/14/2020. Appellee Amanda Hill answering brief due 01/13/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11813612] (JBS) [Entered: 09/04/2020 10:51 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Amanda Hill, et al v. Quicken Loans, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AMANDA HILL, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Jason Ibey
Represented By: David William Hall Esquire
Represented By: Frank S. Hedin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: QUICKEN LOANS, LLC, FKA Quicken Loans Inc.
Represented By: Laura A. Stoll
Represented By: Brooks Russell Brown
Represented By: William M. Jay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAYLE HYDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?