City of Los Angeles v. William Barr, et al
Defendant / Appellant: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and LAURA ROGERS, in her official capacity as Acting Principal Deputy Assistant Attorney General of the Office of Justice Programs
Plaintiff / Appellee: CITY OF LOS ANGELES
Case Number: 20-55926
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/11/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11820677]. [20-55926] (AD) [Entered: 09/11/2020 12:44 PM]
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellants William P. Barr, Laura Rogers and USDOJ Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/11/2020. [11820479] [20-55926] (Myron, Laura) [Entered: 09/11/2020 11:26 AM]
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Attorney Joseph J. DeMott in 20-55926 substituted by Attorney Laura Myron in 20-55926 [11817555] (RR) [Entered: 09/09/2020 12:24 PM]
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Laura E. Myron (U.S. Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Room 7228, Washington DC 20530) for Appellants William P. Barr, Laura Rogers and USDOJ. Substitution for Attorney Joseph J. DeMott for Appellants William P. Barr, Laura Rogers and USDOJ. Date of service: 09/09/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11817392] [20-55926] (Myron, Laura) [Entered: 09/09/2020 11:01 AM]
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 Added Attorney(s) Daniel Tenny for party(s) Appellant William P. Barr Appellant Laura Rogers Appellant USDOJ, in case 20-55926. [11817346] (RR) [Entered: 09/09/2020 10:43 AM]
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Daniel Tenny (950 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Room 7215, Washington, DC 20530) for Appellants William P. Barr, USDOJ and Laura Rogers. Date of service: 09/09/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11816884] [20-55926] (Tenny, Daniel) [Entered: 09/09/2020 06:08 AM]
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants William P. Barr, Attorney General, Laura Rogers and United States Department of Justice Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/11/2020. Transcript ordered by 10/05/2020. Transcript due 11/03/2020. Appellants William P. Barr, Attorney General, Laura Rogers and United States Department of Justice opening brief due 12/14/2020. Appellee City of Los Angeles answering brief due 01/13/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11814121] (JBS) [Entered: 09/04/2020 03:23 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: City of Los Angeles v. William Barr, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Represented By: Laura Myron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Represented By: Laura Myron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LAURA ROGERS, in her official capacity as Acting Principal Deputy Assistant Attorney General of the Office of Justice Programs
Represented By: Daniel Tenny
Represented By: Laura Myron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CITY OF LOS ANGELES
Represented By: Neema Sahni
Represented By: Mitchell Aaron Kamin
Represented By: Michael Nelson Feuer Esquire
Represented By: James Patrick Clark Esquire
Represented By: Michael Dundas
Represented By: David Meir Zionts
Represented By: Kathleen Alice Kenealy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?