Mikel Toye, et al v. NewRez LLC, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: MIKEL A. TOYE, husband and LOUISE TOYE, wife
Defendant / Appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, as Trustee for the Certificate Holders Swalt, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2006-OA16, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, FKA The Bank of New York, NEWREZ LLC, DBA Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Case Number: 20-55935
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 22, 2021 MIKEL TOYE V. NEWREZ LLC

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11851612] (BLS) [Entered: 10/07/2020 06:56 PM]
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 10/01/2020, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11836002] (BLS) [Entered: 09/24/2020 02:55 PM]
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/15/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11825518]. [20-55935] (AD) [Entered: 09/16/2020 06:44 AM]
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Appellants Louise Toye and Mikel A. Toye Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/15/2020. [11825492] [20-55935] (Marshall, Charles) [Entered: 09/15/2020 10:38 PM]
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 Added Attorney(s) Neeru Jindal for party(s) Appellee NewRez LLC Appellee Bank of New York Mellon, in case 20-55935. [11818933] (JFF) [Entered: 09/10/2020 11:38 AM]
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Neeru Jindal (633 West Fifth Street, Suite 2800 Los Angeles, CA 90071) for Appellees Bank of New York Mellon and NewRez LLC. Date of service: 09/10/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11818900] [20-55935] (Jindal, Neeru) [Entered: 09/10/2020 11:23 AM]
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Attorney J. Owen Campbell in 20-55935 substituted by Attorney Kerry W. Franich in 20-55935 [11817303] (JFF) [Entered: 09/09/2020 10:31 AM]
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 Added Attorney(s) Jan T. Chilton for party(s) Appellee Bank of America, N.A., in case 20-55935. [11817294] (JFF) [Entered: 09/09/2020 10:29 AM]
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jan T. Chilton (Severson & Werson, One Embarcadero Center, 26th Fl., San Francisco, CA 94111) for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Date of service: 09/09/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11816969] [20-55935] (Chilton, Jan) [Entered: 09/09/2020 08:22 AM]
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kerry W. Franich (Severson & Werson 19100 Von Karman Ave., #700, Irvine, CA 92612) for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Substitution for Attorney Mr. John Owen Campbell, Esquire for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. Date of service: 09/09/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11816966] [20-55935] (Franich, Kerry) [Entered: 09/09/2020 08:19 AM]
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Louise Toye and Mikel A. Toye Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/15/2020. Transcript ordered by 10/05/2020. Transcript due 11/03/2020. Appellants Louise Toye and Mikel A. Toye opening brief due 12/14/2020. Appellees Bank of America, N.A., Bank of New York Mellon and NewRez LLC answering brief due 01/13/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11816370] (JBS) [Entered: 09/08/2020 03:40 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mikel Toye, et al v. NewRez LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIKEL A. TOYE, husband
Represented By: Charles Thomas Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LOUISE TOYE, wife
Represented By: Charles Thomas Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, as Trustee for the Certificate Holders Swalt, Inc. Alternative Loan Trust 2006-OA16, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, FKA The Bank of New York
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Represented By: Neeru Jindal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEWREZ LLC, DBA Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Pavel Ekmekchyan
Represented By: Neeru Jindal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Represented By: Jan T. Chilton
Represented By: Kerry W. Franich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?