Mary Amador, et al v. Leroy Baca, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: MYESHIA WILLIAMS, DIANE VIGIL, DIANA PAIZ, MARY AMADOR, NANCY BRISENO, individually and as class representatives, LORA BARRANCA, EVANGELINA MADRID, ALISA BATTISTE and FELICE CHOLEWIAK
Defendant / Appellee: LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, a California public entity, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a governmental entity, LEROY D. BACA, Sheriff, in his official capacity, JOHN H. CLARK, DANIEL CRUZ, LUZ MEDINA, DENNIS BURNS, YVONNE CRUZ, STACY L. LEE, SAMMY JONES, DOES, 1 through 10, GERALD K. COOPER and TIMOTHY CORNELL
Appellant: LECIA L. SHORTER
Case Number: 20-55965
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Appellant Lecia L. Shorter reply to response (). Date of service: 11/02/2020. [11878096] [20-55965] (Shorter, Lecia) [Entered: 11/02/2020 01:06 AM]
October 25, 2020 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Appellees Mary Amador, Lora Barranca, Alisa Battiste, Nancy Briseno, Felice Cholewiak, Evangelina Madrid, Diana Paiz, Diane Vigil and Myeshia Williams response opposing motion (motion [ # 6 ] to proceed in forma pauperis). Date of service: 10/25/2020. [11870906] [20-55965]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 10/26/2020 by SLM] (Litt, Barrett) [Entered: 10/25/2020 03:16 PM]
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 Fee status changed ( [Case Number 20-55965: IFP Pending In COA] ). [11869550] (RL) [Entered: 10/23/2020 09:25 AM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellant Lecia L. Shorter Affidavit Accompanying Motion for Permission to Appeal In Forma Pauperis (Form 4). Date of service: 10/22/2020. [11869003] [20-55965] (Shorter, Lecia) [Entered: 10/22/2020 03:33 PM]
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Appellees Mary Amador, Lora Barranca, Alisa Battiste, Nancy Briseno, Felice Cholewiak, Evangelina Madrid, Diana Paiz, Diane Vigil and Myeshia Williams reply to response (). Date of service: 10/22/2020. [11868317] [20-55965] (Litt, Barrett) [Entered: 10/22/2020 10:40 AM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Lecia L. Shorter response opposing motion ([ # 3 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 3 ] Motion (ECF Filing)). Date of service: 10/16/2020. [11862412] [20-55965] (Shorter, Lecia) [Entered: 10/16/2020 04:16 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellees Mary Amador, Lora Barranca, Alisa Battiste, Nancy Briseno, Felice Cholewiak, Evangelina Madrid, Diana Paiz, Diane Vigil and Myeshia Williams Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 10/01/2020. [11843535] --[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [2] .] (TYL) [Entered: 10/01/2020 10:21 AM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 3 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellees Mary Amador, Lora Barranca, Alisa Battiste, Nancy Briseno, Felice Cholewiak, Evangelina Madrid, Diana Paiz, Diane Vigil and Myeshia Williams answer to Miscellaneous petition. Date of service: 10/01/2020. [11843389] [20-55965] (Litt, Barrett) [Entered: 10/01/2020 09:27 AM]
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 10/19/2020. Transcript due 11/17/2020. Appellant Lecia L. Shorter opening brief due 12/24/2020. Appellees Mary Amador, Leroy D. Baca, Lora Barranca, Alisa Battiste, Nancy Briseno, Dennis Burns, Felice Cholewiak, John H. Clark, Gerald K. Cooper, Timothy Cornell, County of Los Angeles, Daniel Cruz, Yvonne Cruz, Does, Sammy Jones, Stacy L. Lee, Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department, Evangelina Madrid, Luz Medina, Diana Paiz, Diane Vigil and Myeshia Williams answering brief due 01/25/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11828809] (RT) [Entered: 09/18/2020 09:42 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mary Amador, et al v. Leroy Baca, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MYESHIA WILLIAMS
Represented By: Donald W. Cook
Represented By: Lindsay Brooke Battles
Represented By: Barrett Stephen Litt Esquire
Represented By: Colleen Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DIANE VIGIL
Represented By: Donald W. Cook
Represented By: Lindsay Brooke Battles
Represented By: Barrett Stephen Litt Esquire
Represented By: Colleen Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DIANA PAIZ
Represented By: Donald W. Cook
Represented By: Lindsay Brooke Battles
Represented By: Barrett Stephen Litt Esquire
Represented By: Colleen Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARY AMADOR
Represented By: Donald W. Cook
Represented By: Lindsay Brooke Battles
Represented By: Barrett Stephen Litt Esquire
Represented By: Colleen Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NANCY BRISENO, individually and as class representatives
Represented By: Donald W. Cook
Represented By: Lindsay Brooke Battles
Represented By: Barrett Stephen Litt Esquire
Represented By: Colleen Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LORA BARRANCA
Represented By: Donald W. Cook
Represented By: Lindsay Brooke Battles
Represented By: Barrett Stephen Litt Esquire
Represented By: Colleen Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EVANGELINA MADRID
Represented By: Donald W. Cook
Represented By: Lindsay Brooke Battles
Represented By: Barrett Stephen Litt Esquire
Represented By: Colleen Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALISA BATTISTE
Represented By: Donald W. Cook
Represented By: Lindsay Brooke Battles
Represented By: Barrett Stephen Litt Esquire
Represented By: Colleen Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FELICE CHOLEWIAK
Represented By: Donald W. Cook
Represented By: Lindsay Brooke Battles
Represented By: Barrett Stephen Litt Esquire
Represented By: Colleen Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, a California public entity
Represented By: Justin William Clark
Represented By: Paul B. Beach Esquire
Represented By: Jin Suk Choi Esquire
Represented By: Andrew Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a governmental entity
Represented By: Justin William Clark
Represented By: Paul B. Beach Esquire
Represented By: Jin Suk Choi Esquire
Represented By: Andrew Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEROY D. BACA, Sheriff, in his official capacity
Represented By: Justin William Clark
Represented By: Paul B. Beach Esquire
Represented By: Jin Suk Choi Esquire
Represented By: Andrew Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN H. CLARK
Represented By: Justin William Clark
Represented By: Paul B. Beach Esquire
Represented By: Jin Suk Choi Esquire
Represented By: Andrew Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL CRUZ
Represented By: Justin William Clark
Represented By: Paul B. Beach Esquire
Represented By: Jin Suk Choi Esquire
Represented By: Andrew Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LUZ MEDINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENNIS BURNS
Represented By: Justin William Clark
Represented By: Paul B. Beach Esquire
Represented By: Jin Suk Choi Esquire
Represented By: Andrew Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: YVONNE CRUZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STACY L. LEE
Represented By: Justin William Clark
Represented By: Paul B. Beach Esquire
Represented By: Jin Suk Choi Esquire
Represented By: Andrew Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMMY JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES, 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GERALD K. COOPER
Represented By: Justin William Clark
Represented By: Paul B. Beach Esquire
Represented By: Jin Suk Choi Esquire
Represented By: Andrew Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY CORNELL
Represented By: Justin William Clark
Represented By: Paul B. Beach Esquire
Represented By: Jin Suk Choi Esquire
Represented By: Andrew Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: LECIA L. SHORTER
Represented By: Lecia L. Shorter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?