John Doe v. William Barr, et al
Defendant / Appellee: DOES, 1 through 10, Inclusive, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY, official and personal capacity as Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOHN DOE, an individual
Case Number: 20-56063
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 10 Streamlined request [9] by Appellant John Doe to extend time to file the brief is approved. Streamlined requests allow for a 30 day extension of time to file the brief. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant John Doe opening brief due 01/19/2021. Appellees William P. Barr, Attorney General, Does, Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice and Christopher A. Wray answering brief due 02/18/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11923824] (JN) [Entered: 12/11/2020 08:25 AM]
December 10, 2020 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant John Doe. New requested due date is 01/15/2021. [11923615] [20-56063] (Novak, Richard) [Entered: 12/10/2020 07:16 PM]
December 9, 2020 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. The briefing schedule previously established by the court remains in effect. [11920002] (LW) [Entered: 12/09/2020 10:38 AM]
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 Filed order MEDIATION (LW): The courts November 3, 2020 order at docket entry [ # 5 ] is VACATED. [11881303] (SB) [Entered: 11/04/2020 08:19 AM]
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 11/17/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11880959] (LW) [Entered: 11/03/2020 03:23 PM]
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 11/17/2020. See order for details. [11880837] (LW) [Entered: 11/03/2020 02:39 PM]
November 1, 2020 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/01/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11878086]. [20-56063] (AD) [Entered: 11/01/2020 06:44 PM]
November 1, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant John Doe Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/01/2020. [11878076] [20-56063] (Novak, Richard) [Entered: 11/01/2020 03:18 PM]
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The court of appeals' records do not indicate that appellant has filed a mediation questionnaire in accordance with Cir. R. 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellant shall file a Mediation Questionnaire or dismiss the appeal voluntarily. [11876236] (LW) [Entered: 10/29/2020 03:35 PM]
October 15, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant John Doe Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/22/2020. Appellant John Doe opening brief due 12/17/2020. Appellees William P. Barr, Attorney General, Does, Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice and Christopher A. Wray answering brief due 01/19/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11860518] (RT) [Entered: 10/15/2020 03:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: John Doe v. William Barr, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES, 1 through 10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Represented By: Daniel Beck
Represented By: Joanne Schwartz Osinoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Represented By: Daniel Beck
Represented By: Joanne Schwartz Osinoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Daniel Beck
Represented By: Joanne Schwartz Osinoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY, official and personal capacity as Director of the Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Daniel Beck
Represented By: Joanne Schwartz Osinoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN DOE, an individual
Represented By: Richard Glenn Novak Esquire
Represented By: Donald Jay Ritt Esquire
Represented By: Tiffany W. Tai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?