Donald McDougall, et al v. County of Ventura, et al
Defendant / Appellee: VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC HEALTH CARE AGENCY, COUNTY OF VENTURA, ROBERT LEVIN, WILLIAM T. FOLEY and BILL AYUB
Plaintiff / Appellant: SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, JULIANA GARCIA, an individual, CALIFORNIA GUN RIGHTS FOUNDATION, DONALD MCDOUGALL, an individual and FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC.
Case Number: 20-56220
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 Streamlined request [6] by Appellants California Gun Rights Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Juliana Garcia, Donald McDougall and Second Amendment Foundation to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants California Gun Rights Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Juliana Garcia, Donald McDougall and Second Amendment Foundation opening brief due 02/18/2021. Appellees Bill Ayub, County of Ventura, William T. Foley, Robert Levin and Ventura County Public Health Care Agency answering brief due 03/22/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11963203] (BG) [Entered: 01/14/2021 07:42 AM]
January 14, 2021 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants California Gun Rights Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Juliana Garcia, Donald McDougall and Second Amendment Foundation. New requested due date is 02/18/2021. [11963173] [20-56220] (DiGuiseppe, Raymond) [Entered: 01/14/2021 05:54 AM]
December 15, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11929014] (BLS) [Entered: 12/15/2020 05:38 PM]
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 12/15/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11910390] (BLS) [Entered: 12/01/2020 08:46 AM]
November 27, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/27/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11907827]. [20-56220] (AD) [Entered: 11/27/2020 12:44 PM]
November 27, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants California Gun Rights Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Juliana Garcia, Donald McDougall and Second Amendment Foundation Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/27/2020. [11907728] [20-56220] (DiGuiseppe, Raymond) [Entered: 11/27/2020 11:24 AM]
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants California Gun Rights Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Juliana Garcia, Donald McDougall and Second Amendment Foundation Mediation Questionnaire due on 11/27/2020. Appellants California Gun Rights Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Juliana Garcia, Donald McDougall and Second Amendment Foundation opening brief due 01/19/2021. Appellees Bill Ayub, County of Ventura, William T. Foley, Robert Levin and Ventura County Public Health Care Agency answering brief due 02/18/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11900175] (JBS) [Entered: 11/19/2020 04:55 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Donald McDougall, et al v. County of Ventura, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: VENTURA COUNTY PUBLIC HEALTH CARE AGENCY
Represented By: Emily T. Gardner
Represented By: Emily Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTY OF VENTURA
Represented By: Emily T. Gardner
Represented By: Emily Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ROBERT LEVIN
Represented By: Emily T. Gardner
Represented By: Emily Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM T. FOLEY
Represented By: Emily T. Gardner
Represented By: Emily Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BILL AYUB
Represented By: Emily T. Gardner
Represented By: Emily Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION
Represented By: Jerome Clay
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JULIANA GARCIA, an individual
Represented By: Jerome Clay
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CALIFORNIA GUN RIGHTS FOUNDATION
Represented By: Jerome Clay
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DONALD MCDOUGALL, an individual
Represented By: Jerome Clay
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC.
Represented By: Jerome Clay
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?