Jonah Martinez, et al v. Alex Villanueva, et al
Defendant / Appellee: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, BARBARA FERRER and ALEX VILLANUEVA
Plaintiff / Appellant: SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, WEYLAND-YUTANI LLC, DBA Match Grade Gunsmiths, ALAN KUSHNER, FIREARMS POLICY COALITIONS, INC., THE TARGET RANGE, A PLACE TO SHOOT, INC., NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, CALIFORNIA GUN RIGHTS FOUNDATION, TOM WATT, JASON MONTES and JONAH MARTINEZ
Case Number: 20-56233
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 Streamlined request [6] by Appellants A Place to Shoot, Inc., California Gun Rights Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalitions, Inc., Alan Kushner, Jonah Martinez, Jason Montes, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation, The Target Range, Tom Watt and Weyland-Yutani LLC to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants A Place to Shoot, Inc., California Gun Rights Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalitions, Inc., Alan Kushner, Jonah Martinez, Jason Montes, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation, The Target Range, Tom Watt and Weyland-Yutani LLC opening brief due 02/18/2021. Appellees County of Los Angeles, Barbara Ferrer and Alex Villanueva answering brief due 03/22/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11964192] (BG) [Entered: 01/14/2021 02:27 PM]
January 14, 2021 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants A Place to Shoot, Inc., California Gun Rights Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalitions, Inc., Alan Kushner, Jonah Martinez, Jason Montes, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation, The Target Range, Tom Watt and Weyland-Yutani LLC. New requested due date is 02/18/2021. [11963229] [20-56233] (DiGuiseppe, Raymond) [Entered: 01/14/2021 08:13 AM]
December 16, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11930228] (VS) [Entered: 12/16/2020 02:49 PM]
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 12/16/2020, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11911611] (VS) [Entered: 12/01/2020 04:19 PM]
November 27, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/27/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11908237]. [20-56233] (AD) [Entered: 11/27/2020 06:44 PM]
November 27, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants A Place to Shoot, Inc., California Gun Rights Foundation, Firearms Policy Coalitions, Inc., Alan Kushner, Jonah Martinez, Jason Montes, National Rifle Association of America, Second Amendment Foundation, The Target Range, Tom Watt and Weyland-Yutani LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/27/2020. [11908067] [20-56233] (DiGuiseppe, Raymond) [Entered: 11/27/2020 03:40 PM]
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Jonah Martinez, et al. Questionnaire due on 11/30/2020. Appellants Jonah Martinez, et al. opening brief due 01/19/2021. Appellees Alex Villanueva, et al. answering brief due 02/17/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [COURT UPDATE: re-sent NDA with Mediation Letter attached] [11902892] (JPD) [Entered: 11/23/2020 10:27 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jonah Martinez, et al v. Alex Villanueva, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES
Represented By: Paul B. Beach Esquire
Represented By: Jin Suk Choi Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BARBARA FERRER
Represented By: Paul B. Beach Esquire
Represented By: Jin Suk Choi Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALEX VILLANUEVA
Represented By: Paul B. Beach Esquire
Represented By: Jin Suk Choi Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WEYLAND-YUTANI LLC, DBA Match Grade Gunsmiths
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALAN KUSHNER
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FIREARMS POLICY COALITIONS, INC.
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THE TARGET RANGE
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: A PLACE TO SHOOT, INC.
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NATIONAL RIFLE ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CALIFORNIA GUN RIGHTS FOUNDATION
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TOM WATT
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JASON MONTES
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JONAH MARTINEZ
Represented By: George M. Lee
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
Represented By: Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?