Ambercity Hospice, Inc. v. Alex Azar, II
Plaintiff / Appellant: AMBERCITY HOSPICE, INC., a California corporation
Defendant / Appellee: ALEX M. AZAR II, Secretary of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 20-56242
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Granting Motion [ # 4 ] (ECF Filing) filed by Appellant Ambercity Hospice, Inc.; Appellant Ambercity Hospice, Inc. opening brief due 02/22/2021. Appellee Alex M. Azar II answering brief due 03/24/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11974530] (GS) [Entered: 01/21/2021 10:10 AM]
January 20, 2021 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Ambercity Hospice, Inc. Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 02/22/2021. Date of service: 01/20/2021. [11969051] [20-56242] (Brownstein, William) [Entered: 01/20/2021 08:30 AM]
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 11/30/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11909250]. [20-56242] (AD) [Entered: 11/30/2020 12:44 PM]
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Ambercity Hospice, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 11/30/2020. [11908944] [20-56242] (Brownstein, William) [Entered: 11/30/2020 10:34 AM]
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Ambercity Hospice, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/01/2020. Appellant Ambercity Hospice, Inc. opening brief due 01/21/2021. Appellee Alex M. Azar II answering brief due 02/22/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11905633] (RT) [Entered: 11/24/2020 03:17 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ambercity Hospice, Inc. v. Alex Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: AMBERCITY HOSPICE, INC., a California corporation
Represented By: William H. Brownstein Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALEX M. AZAR II, Secretary of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Hillary Burrelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?