Mary Amador, et al v. Leroy Baca, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: MYESHIA WILLIAMS, DIANE VIGIL, DIANA PAIZ, MARY AMADOR, NANCY BRISENO, individually and as class representatives, LORA BARRANCA, EVANGELINA MADRID, ALISA BATTISTE and FELICE CHOLEWIAK
Defendant / Appellee: LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, a California public entity, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a governmental entity, LEROY D. BACA, Sheriff, in his official capacity, JOHN H. CLARK, DANIEL CRUZ, LUZ MEDINA, DENNIS BURNS, YVONNE CRUZ, STACY L. LEE, SAMMY JONES, DOES, 1 through 10, GERALD K. COOPER and TIMOTHY CORNELL
Appellant: LECIA L. SHORTER
Case Number: 20-56278
Filed: December 2, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Filing 4 Fee status changed ( [Case Number 20-56278: IFP Pending In COA] ). [11970003] (DJV) [Entered: 01/20/2021 03:23 PM]
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Lecia L. Shorter Motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Date of service: 01/20/2021. [11969445] [20-56278] (Shorter, Lecia) [Entered: 01/20/2021 11:47 AM]
December 16, 2020 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CO): A review of the district courts docket reflects that the district court denied appellant Lecia Shorters motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis for this appeal of the district courts October 29, 2020 order denying appellants motion to intervene, because it found that the appeal is frivolous. This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellant also must: (1) file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, OR (2) pay to the district court $505.00 for the filing and docketing fees for this appeal AND file in this court proof that the $505.00 was paid. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellee may file a response within 10 days after service of appellants statement. The briefing schedule for this appeal is stayed. The Clerk shall serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward, and (3) a Form 4 financial affidavit. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss the appeal, statement that the appeal should go forward, and/or motion to proceed in forma pauperis. [11930203] (CKP) [Entered: 12/16/2020 02:38 PM]
December 2, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 01/04/2021. Transcript due 02/02/2021. Appellant Lecia L. Shorter opening brief due 03/12/2021. Appellees Mary Amador, Leroy D. Baca, Lora Barranca, Alisa Battiste, Nancy Briseno, Dennis Burns, Felice Cholewiak, John H. Clark, Gerald K. Cooper, Timothy Cornell, County of Los Angeles, Daniel Cruz, Yvonne Cruz, Does, Sammy Jones, Stacy L. Lee, Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department, Evangelina Madrid, Luz Medina, Diana Paiz, Diane Vigil and Myeshia Williams answering brief due 04/12/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11912900] (RT) [Entered: 12/02/2020 02:56 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mary Amador, et al v. Leroy Baca, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MYESHIA WILLIAMS
Represented By: Donald W. Cook
Represented By: Lindsay Brooke Battles
Represented By: Barrett Stephen Litt Esquire
Represented By: Colleen Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DIANE VIGIL
Represented By: Donald W. Cook
Represented By: Lindsay Brooke Battles
Represented By: Barrett Stephen Litt Esquire
Represented By: Colleen Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DIANA PAIZ
Represented By: Donald W. Cook
Represented By: Lindsay Brooke Battles
Represented By: Barrett Stephen Litt Esquire
Represented By: Colleen Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARY AMADOR
Represented By: Donald W. Cook
Represented By: Lindsay Brooke Battles
Represented By: Barrett Stephen Litt Esquire
Represented By: Colleen Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NANCY BRISENO, individually and as class representatives
Represented By: Donald W. Cook
Represented By: Lindsay Brooke Battles
Represented By: Barrett Stephen Litt Esquire
Represented By: Colleen Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LORA BARRANCA
Represented By: Donald W. Cook
Represented By: Lindsay Brooke Battles
Represented By: Barrett Stephen Litt Esquire
Represented By: Colleen Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EVANGELINA MADRID
Represented By: Donald W. Cook
Represented By: Lindsay Brooke Battles
Represented By: Barrett Stephen Litt Esquire
Represented By: Colleen Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALISA BATTISTE
Represented By: Donald W. Cook
Represented By: Lindsay Brooke Battles
Represented By: Barrett Stephen Litt Esquire
Represented By: Colleen Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FELICE CHOLEWIAK
Represented By: Donald W. Cook
Represented By: Lindsay Brooke Battles
Represented By: Barrett Stephen Litt Esquire
Represented By: Colleen Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, a California public entity
Represented By: Justin William Clark
Represented By: Paul B. Beach Esquire
Represented By: Jin Suk Choi Esquire
Represented By: Andrew Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a governmental entity
Represented By: Justin William Clark
Represented By: Paul B. Beach Esquire
Represented By: Jin Suk Choi Esquire
Represented By: Andrew Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEROY D. BACA, Sheriff, in his official capacity
Represented By: Justin William Clark
Represented By: Paul B. Beach Esquire
Represented By: Jin Suk Choi Esquire
Represented By: Andrew Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN H. CLARK
Represented By: Justin William Clark
Represented By: Paul B. Beach Esquire
Represented By: Jin Suk Choi Esquire
Represented By: Andrew Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL CRUZ
Represented By: Justin William Clark
Represented By: Paul B. Beach Esquire
Represented By: Jin Suk Choi Esquire
Represented By: Andrew Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LUZ MEDINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENNIS BURNS
Represented By: Justin William Clark
Represented By: Jin Suk Choi Esquire
Represented By: Andrew Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: YVONNE CRUZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STACY L. LEE
Represented By: Justin William Clark
Represented By: Paul B. Beach Esquire
Represented By: Jin Suk Choi Esquire
Represented By: Andrew Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SAMMY JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES, 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GERALD K. COOPER
Represented By: Justin William Clark
Represented By: Paul B. Beach Esquire
Represented By: Jin Suk Choi Esquire
Represented By: Andrew Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TIMOTHY CORNELL
Represented By: Justin William Clark
Represented By: Paul B. Beach Esquire
Represented By: Jin Suk Choi Esquire
Represented By: Andrew Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: LECIA L. SHORTER
Represented By: Lecia L. Shorter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?