Lance Williams v. R. Hernandez, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: LANCE ELLIOT WILLIAMS
Defendant / Appellee: R. HERNANDEZ, Medical Facility Correctional Officer, individual, D. BRAZIL, Corrections Officer employee, individual and D. JOSEPH, Corrections Officer employee, individual
Case Number: 20-56292
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Lance Elliot Williams opening brief of 6 pages (Informal: Yes). Served on 12/17/2020. Major deficiency: briefing is stayed (IFP motion pending). [11937275] (KWG) [Entered: 12/22/2020 03:21 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Lance Elliot Williams motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [11937245] (NAC) [Entered: 12/22/2020 03:15 PM]
December 9, 2020 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [11920274] (CKP) [Entered: 12/09/2020 11:50 AM]
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Lance Elliot Williams opening brief due 02/01/2021. [11916417] (JPD) [Entered: 12/07/2020 09:22 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Lance Williams v. R. Hernandez, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LANCE ELLIOT WILLIAMS
Represented By: Lance Elliot Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R. HERNANDEZ, Medical Facility Correctional Officer, individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: D. BRAZIL, Corrections Officer employee, individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: D. JOSEPH, Corrections Officer employee, individual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?