Kristine Bistline v. Ditech Financial LLC, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: KRISTINE ANN BISTLINE
Defendant / Appellee: DOES, 1-30, DITECH FINANCIAL LLC, doing business in the state of California, FKA Green Tree Servicing LLC and FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Case Number: 20-56323
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Filing 7 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [11999856] (BLS) [Entered: 02/10/2021 03:59 PM]
January 14, 2021 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellant Kristine Ann Bistline Correspondence: NOTICE OF APPELLANT COMPLIANCE WITH TIME SCHEDULING ORDER (Doc. 1-1) RE: TRANSCRIPTS ORDERING. Date of service: 01/14/2021 [11964157] [20-56323] (Kulick, Andrew) [Entered: 01/14/2021 02:18 PM]
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/10/2021, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11938931] (BLS) [Entered: 12/23/2020 05:34 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/21/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11935925]. [20-56323] (AD) [Entered: 12/21/2020 06:44 PM]
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellant Kristine Ann Bistline Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/21/2020. [11935061] [20-56323] (Kulick, Andrew) [Entered: 12/21/2020 01:13 PM]
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 Entered appearance of Court Reporter Alberto V. Ortiz in this case. [11928372] (JMR) [Entered: 12/15/2020 01:26 PM]
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Kristine Ann Bistline Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/22/2020. Transcript ordered by 01/13/2021. Transcript due 02/12/2021. Appellant Kristine Ann Bistline opening brief due 03/24/2021. Appellees Ditech Financial LLC and Does answering brief due 04/23/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11928368] (JMR) [Entered: 12/15/2020 01:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kristine Bistline v. Ditech Financial LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KRISTINE ANN BISTLINE
Represented By: Andrew Jay Kulick Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES, 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC, doing business in the state of California, FKA Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: Kelly Andrew Beall Esquire
Represented By: Stuart Bruce Wolfe Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?