Silverado Hospice, Inc. v. Alex Azar, II
Plaintiff / Appellant: SILVERADO HOSPICE, INC., a Delaware corporation and PROCARE HOSPICE, LLC, a Delaware limited liability corporation
Defendant / Appellee: ALEX M. AZAR II, Secretary of United States Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 20-56348
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Filing 11 Added Attorney(s) Alisa Beth Klein, McKaye Lea Neumeister for party(s) Appellee Alex M. Azar II. [11996787] (RL) [Entered: 02/08/2021 04:54 PM]
February 8, 2021 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of McKaye Lea Neumeister (U.S. Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W., Room 7231, Washington, DC 20530) for Appellee Alex M. Azar, II. Date of service: 02/08/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11996761] [20-56348] (Neumeister, McKaye) [Entered: 02/08/2021 04:47 PM]
February 8, 2021 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Alisa B. Klein (U.S. Department of Justice, Civil Appellate, 950 Pennsylvania Ave. NW room 7235, Washington DC 20530) for Appellee Alex M. Azar, II. Date of service: 02/08/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11996757] [20-56348] (Klein, Alisa) [Entered: 02/08/2021 04:46 PM]
January 20, 2021 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [11970095] (VS) [Entered: 01/20/2021 04:06 PM]
January 14, 2021 Filing 7 Streamlined request [6] by Appellants ProCare Hospice, LLC and Silverado Hospice, Inc. to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellants ProCare Hospice, LLC and Silverado Hospice, Inc. opening brief due 03/22/2021. Appellee Alex M. Azar II answering brief due 04/21/2021. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [11963222] (JN) [Entered: 01/14/2021 08:08 AM]
January 13, 2021 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellants Silverado Hospice, Inc. and ProCare Hospice, LLC. New requested due date is 03/22/2021. [11962965] [20-56348] (Halgren, Matthew) [Entered: 01/13/2021 04:34 PM]
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 01/19/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [11951129] (VS) [Entered: 01/04/2021 01:17 PM]
December 29, 2020 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellants Silverado Hospice, Inc. and ProCare Hospice, LLC Correspondence: Pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 10-3.1(c), Providing Copy of Notice Filed in District Court Stating that No Transcripts of Oral Proceedings Will Be Ordered. Date of service: 12/29/2020 [11947757] [20-56348] (Halgren, Matthew) [Entered: 12/29/2020 02:53 PM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/28/2020. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11946082]. [20-56348] (AD) [Entered: 12/28/2020 12:44 PM]
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants ProCare Hospice, LLC and Silverado Hospice, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/28/2020. [11945659] [20-56348] (Daucher, Brian) [Entered: 12/28/2020 09:44 AM]
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants ProCare Hospice, LLC and Silverado Hospice, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/28/2020. Appellants ProCare Hospice, LLC and Silverado Hospice, Inc. opening brief due 02/18/2021. Appellee Alex M. Azar II answering brief due 03/18/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11932888] (RT) [Entered: 12/18/2020 11:43 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Silverado Hospice, Inc. v. Alex Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SILVERADO HOSPICE, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Brian McCracken Daucher
Represented By: Matthew G. Halgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PROCARE HOSPICE, LLC, a Delaware limited liability corporation
Represented By: Brian McCracken Daucher
Represented By: Matthew G. Halgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALEX M. AZAR II, Secretary of United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Karen Paik
Represented By: McKaye Lea Neumeister
Represented By: Alisa Beth Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?