Susan Barber v. USDC, San FranciscoIn re: Susan Barber v. USDC, San Francisco
Petitioner: SUSAN J. BARBER
Respondent: USDC, SAN FRANCISCO
Not Classified By Court: DEREK F.C. ELLIOTT, JAMES B. CATLEDGE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and In re: SUSAN J. BARBER
Case Number: 20-71276
Filed: May 4, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 12, 2020 Summary Barber v. USDC, San Francisco

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 Filed order (BARRY G. SILVERMAN, JACQUELINE H. NGUYEN and DANIEL PAUL COLLINS): This petition raises issues that warrant a response. See Fed. R. App. P. 21(b). Any real party in interest may file a response by 5:00 pm Pacific Time on Wednesday May 6, 2020. The district court may file a response simultaneously if it so desires. We sua sponte continue disposition of this petition for writ of mandamus until Tuesday, May 12, 2020. See 18 U.S.C. 3771(d)(3) (setting forth timeline for decision under Crime Victims Rights Act). The Clerk shall serve a copy of this order on the district court. [11680599] (AF) [Entered: 05/05/2020 09:16 AM]
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 Entered appearance of Real Party in Interest Derek F.C. Elliott. [11680521] (TYL) [Entered: 05/05/2020 08:41 AM]
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 FILED CVRA PROSE PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS. DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. NOTIFIED REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST OF FILING. [11680185] (BY) [Entered: 05/04/2020 05:02 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Susan Barber v. USDC, San FranciscoIn re: Susan Barber v. USDC, San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: DEREK F.C. ELLIOTT
Represented By: Brett Richard Parkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: JAMES B. CATLEDGE
Represented By: David Zeltner Chesnoff Esquire
Represented By: Richard A. Schonfeld Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Lloyd A. Farnham
Represented By: Robert David Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: In re: SUSAN J. BARBER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SUSAN J. BARBER
Represented By: Susan J. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USDC, SAN FRANCISCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?