Jose Valencia Birrueta, et al v. William Barr
Petitioner: ERNESTO VALENCIA BIRRUETA, BLANCA LILI VALENCIA BIRRUETA, ROSA ELENA BIRRUETA LEMUS and JOSE MANUEL VALENCIA BIRRUETA
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Case Number: 20-72186
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 15, 2021 JOSE VALENCIA BIRRUETA V. MERRICK GARLAND

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 Added Attorney(s) Brooke Maurer for party(s) Respondent William P. Barr, in case 20-72186. [11770095] (NAC) [Entered: 07/29/2020 07:24 AM]
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of BROOKE MAURER (U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, P.O. BOX 878, BEN FRANKLIN STATION, WASHINGTON, DC 20044) for Respondent William P. Barr. Date of service: 07/29/2020. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11770064] [20-72186] (Maurer, Brooke) [Entered: 07/29/2020 05:32 AM]
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Resources Available As you get ready to prepare your opening brief, please consult the Immigration Outline ( # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/guides/immigration_outline.php ) prepared by court staff and also consider contacting the court's mentoring program (see Appellate Mentoring Program at # http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/attorneys/ ) for help with the brief and argument. (Notice sent to counsel for petitioner.) [11765934]. [20-72186] (CD) [Entered: 07/24/2020 05:40 PM]
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 FILED BIA Petition for Review and Motion for Stay. COUNSELED. Pursuant to G.O. 6.4(c) A TEMPORARY STAY OF REMOVAL IS IN EFFECT pending further order. Petitioner detained? NO. Certified Administrative Record due 08/28/2020. Response to motion for stay due 09/18/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Petitioner opening brief due 10/27/2020 for Rosa Elena Birrueta Lemus, Blanca Lili Valencia Birrueta, Ernesto Valencia Birrueta and Jose Manuel Valencia Birrueta. Respondent brief due 12/28/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Optional reply brief is due 21 days from service of respondent brief. [11765020] (JBS) [Entered: 07/24/2020 10:55 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jose Valencia Birrueta, et al v. William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ERNESTO VALENCIA BIRRUETA
Represented By: Peter Hurtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BLANCA LILI VALENCIA BIRRUETA
Represented By: Peter Hurtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ROSA ELENA BIRRUETA LEMUS
Represented By: Peter Hurtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOSE MANUEL VALENCIA BIRRUETA
Represented By: Peter Hurtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Represented By: Brooke Maurer
Represented By: OIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?