Trendsettah USA, Inc., et al v. Swisher International, Inc.
Petitioner: TRENDSETTAH, INC. and TRENDSETTAH USA, INC.
Respondent: SWISHER INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Case Number: 20-80024
Filed: February 3, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Respondent Swisher International, Inc. response to motion ([ # 2 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 2 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to assign case to prior panel). Date of service: 02/04/2020. [11585102] [20-80024] (Swanson, Daniel) [Entered: 02/04/2020 02:04 PM]
February 3, 2020 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Petitioners Trendsettah USA, Inc. and Trendsettah, Inc. Unopposed Motion to assign case to prior panel. Date of service: 02/03/2020. [11582531] [20-80024] (Poe, Mark) [Entered: 02/03/2020 11:38 AM]
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 FILED ON 01/31/2020 PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SECTION 1292(b). SERVED ON 01/31/2020. [11582360] (JBS) [Entered: 02/03/2020 10:45 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Trendsettah USA, Inc., et al v. Swisher International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TRENDSETTAH, INC.
Represented By: Mark Poe
Represented By: Randolph Gaw Esquire
Represented By: Eric F. Citron
Represented By: Charles Hardy Davis
Represented By: Tom Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TRENDSETTAH USA, INC.
Represented By: Mark Poe
Represented By: Randolph Gaw Esquire
Represented By: Eric F. Citron
Represented By: Charles Hardy Davis
Represented By: Tom Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SWISHER INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Cynthia Richman
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous Esquire Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Eckman
Represented By: Daniel Glen Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?