Caroline Connor v. Unum Life Insurance Company, et al
Defendant: HUMBOLDT MEDICAL SPECIALISTS, INC. EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN
Plaintiff / Appellee: CAROLINE L. CONNOR, M.D.
Defendant / Appellant: UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 21-15034
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Filing 5 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 05/03/2021, 11:00 a.m. Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: Appellant Unum Life Insurance Company of America opening brief due 05/17/2021. Appellee Caroline L. Connor answering brief due 06/16/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [12014443] (CL) [Entered: 02/23/2021 06:48 PM]
February 3, 2021 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 02/17/2021, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [11991392] (CL) [Entered: 02/03/2021 12:45 PM]
January 14, 2021 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/14/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11963904]. [21-15034] (AD) [Entered: 01/14/2021 12:44 PM]
January 14, 2021 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Unum Life Insurance Company of America Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/14/2021. [11963703] [21-15034] (Maguire, Daniel) [Entered: 01/14/2021 11:18 AM]
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Unum Life Insurance Company of America Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/14/2021. Transcript ordered by 02/05/2021. Transcript due 03/08/2021. Appellant Unum Life Insurance Company of America opening brief due 04/16/2021. Appellee Caroline L. Connor answering brief due 05/17/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11955505] (JBS) [Entered: 01/07/2021 10:45 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Caroline Connor v. Unum Life Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CAROLINE L. CONNOR, M.D.
Represented By: Scott E. Calvert
Represented By: Michael Horrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Daniel William Maguire Esquire
Represented By: Karen Tsui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUMBOLDT MEDICAL SPECIALISTS, INC. EMPLOYEE BENEFIT PLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?