USA v. Jessie Cox, et al
Defendant: HUI CHU POOLE, ANIMAL PLACE, DEBBIE DEVITO, SANDRA SEARS-LAVALLEE, DIANE SIBLEY-ORIGLIA, MELANIE GOODPASTURE, 400 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS, SITUATE IN LINCOLN COUNTY, STATE OF NEVADA, HOUSE RABBIT SOCIETY, CHRISTINE WHEATLEY TANIS, CHRISTINE TANIS, MARK TANIS and KATHERINE KELL
Defendant / Appellant: SARAH JANE SHEAHAN, MICHAEL W. SHEAHAN, JOSEPH R. & MICHELLE SHEAHAN, BENJAMIN E. & TERESA SHEAHAN, RUTH ANN HOUX LOUGHRIDGE, ALICIA R. SHEAHAN-HALL, PATRICK JOSEPH SHEAHAN, MICHAEL JAMES SHEAHAN, CHRISTINA FRANCIS SHEAHAN, JESSIE JAMES COX, LISA A. & WILLIAM L. HEGWOOD, BARBARA WHEATLEY FLANAGAN, PATRICK J. & RHONDA SUSAN FLEMING SHEAHAN, MARTHA ALICE SHEAHAN, MARTHA A. & FORD DIXON III SHEAHAN, MARY AVIS SHEAHAN FULLER, JOSEPH RICHARD SHEAHAN, THE ESTATE OF JOHN B. SHEAHAN, BARBARA F. MANNING, Sr., HEIRS OF DANIEL R. SHEAHAN, THE ESTATE OF DANIEL R. SHEAHAN, JR., SHEAHAN FAMILY TRUST, HEIRS OF PATRICIA ANN WHEATLEY, BARBARA S. SHEAHAN and DEANGELO JANE DEANGELO
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 21-15066
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Filing 5 Added Attorney Alexander J Doherty for party(s) Appellant Christina Francis Sheahan Appellant Patrick Joseph Sheahan Appellant Sheahan Family Trust Appellant Barbara F. Manning Sr. Appellant Martha Alice Sheahan Appellant Martha A. & Ford Dixon III Sheahan Appellant Alicia R. Sheahan-Hall Appellant Sarah Jane Sheahan Appellant Barbara Wheatley Flanagan Appellant Patrick J. & Rhonda Susan Fleming Sheahan Appellant Lisa A. & William L. Hegwood Appellant Ruth Ann Houx Loughridge Appellant The Estate of John B. Sheahan Appellant Heirs of Daniel R. Sheahan Appellant Barbara S. Sheahan Appellant Mary Avis Sheahan Fuller Appellant Joseph R. & Michelle Sheahan Appellant The Estate of Daniel R. Sheahan, Jr. Appellant Michael James Sheahan Appellant DeAngelo Jane DeAngelo Appellant Michael W. Sheahan Appellant Benjamin E. & Teresa Sheahan Appellant Joseph Richard Sheahan Appellant Jessie James Cox Appellant Heirs of Patricia Ann Wheatley. [11975242] (DJV) [Entered: 01/21/2021 02:48 PM]
January 21, 2021 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Alexander James Doherty (ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP Three Embarcadero Center, 12th Floor San Francisco, CA 94111-4074) for Appellants Benjamin E. & Teresa Sheahan, Jessie James Cox, DeAngelo Jane DeAngelo, Heirs of Daniel R. Sheahan, Heirs of Patricia Ann Wheatley, Joseph R. & Michelle Sheahan, Lisa A. & William L. Hegwood, Ruth Ann Houx Loughridge, Barbara F. Manning, Sr., Martha A. & Ford Dixon III Sheahan, Patrick J. & Rhonda Susan Fleming Sheahan, Sheahan Family Trust, Mary Avis Sheahan Fuller, Barbara S. Sheahan, Joseph Richard Sheahan, Martha Alice Sheahan, Michael James Sheahan, Michael W. Sheahan, Patrick Joseph Sheahan, Sarah Jane Sheahan, Alicia R. Sheahan-Hall, The Estate of John B. Sheahan, The Estate of Daniel R. Sheahan, Jr., Barbara Wheatley Flanagan and Christina Francis Sheahan. Date of service: 01/21/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [11974829] [21-15066] (Doherty, Alexander) [Entered: 01/21/2021 11:46 AM]
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/19/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[11967876]. [21-15066] (AD) [Entered: 01/19/2021 12:44 PM]
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Benjamin E. & Teresa Sheahan, Jessie James Cox, DeAngelo Jane DeAngelo, Heirs of Daniel R. Sheahan, Heirs of Patricia Ann Wheatley, Joseph R. & Michelle Sheahan, Lisa A. & William L. Hegwood, Ruth Ann Houx Loughridge, Barbara F. Manning, Sr., Martha A. & Ford Dixon III Sheahan, Barbara S. Sheahan, Christina Francis Sheahan, Alicia R. Sheahan-Hall, Joseph Richard Sheahan, Martha Alice Sheahan, Michael W. Sheahan, The Estate of John B. Sheahan, Michael James Sheahan, Patrick Joseph Sheahan, Patrick J. & Rhonda Susan Fleming Sheahan, Sarah Jane Sheahan, Sheahan Family Trust and The Estate of Daniel R. Sheahan, Jr. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/19/2021. [11967290] [21-15066] (Schneider, Michael) [Entered: 01/19/2021 09:44 AM]
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Benjamin E. & Teresa Sheahan, Jessie James Cox, DeAngelo Jane DeAngelo, Heirs of Daniel R. Sheahan, Heirs of Patricia Ann Wheatley, Joseph R. & Michelle Sheahan, Lisa A. & William L. Hegwood, Ruth Ann Houx Loughridge, Barbara F. Manning Sr., Martha A. & Ford Dixon III Sheahan, Patrick J. & Rhonda Susan Fleming Sheahan, Barbara S. Sheahan, Christina Francis Sheahan, Joseph Richard Sheahan, Martha Alice Sheahan, Michael James Sheahan, Michael W. Sheahan, Patrick Joseph Sheahan, Sarah Jane Sheahan, Sheahan Family Trust, Mary Avis Sheahan Fuller, Alicia R. Sheahan-Hall, The Estate of Daniel R. Sheahan, Jr., The Estate of John B. Sheahan and Barbara Wheatley Flanagan Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/19/2021. Transcript ordered by 02/08/2021. Transcript due 03/09/2021. Appellants Benjamin E. & Teresa Sheahan, Jessie James Cox, DeAngelo Jane DeAngelo, Heirs of Daniel R. Sheahan, Heirs of Patricia Ann Wheatley, Joseph R. & Michelle Sheahan, Lisa A. & William L. Hegwood, Ruth Ann Houx Loughridge, Barbara F. Manning Sr., Martha A. & Ford Dixon III Sheahan, Patrick J. & Rhonda Susan Fleming Sheahan, Barbara S. Sheahan, Christina Francis Sheahan, Joseph Richard Sheahan, Martha Alice Sheahan, Michael James Sheahan, Michael W. Sheahan, Patrick Joseph Sheahan, Sarah Jane Sheahan, Sheahan Family Trust, Mary Avis Sheahan Fuller, Alicia R. Sheahan-Hall, The Estate of Daniel R. Sheahan, Jr., The Estate of John B. Sheahan and Barbara Wheatley Flanagan opening brief due 04/19/2021. Appellee United States of America answering brief due 05/18/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11961312] (JBS) [Entered: 01/12/2021 03:45 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. Jessie Cox, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUI CHU POOLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANIMAL PLACE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBBIE DEVITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDRA SEARS-LAVALLEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANE SIBLEY-ORIGLIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELANIE GOODPASTURE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 400 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS, SITUATE IN LINCOLN COUNTY, STATE OF NEVADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOUSE RABBIT SOCIETY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINE WHEATLEY TANIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINE TANIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK TANIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHERINE KELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SARAH JANE SHEAHAN
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MICHAEL W. SHEAHAN
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOSEPH R. & MICHELLE SHEAHAN
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BENJAMIN E. & TERESA SHEAHAN
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: RUTH ANN HOUX LOUGHRIDGE
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ALICIA R. SHEAHAN-HALL
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PATRICK JOSEPH SHEAHAN
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MICHAEL JAMES SHEAHAN
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CHRISTINA FRANCIS SHEAHAN
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JESSIE JAMES COX
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LISA A. & WILLIAM L. HEGWOOD
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BARBARA WHEATLEY FLANAGAN
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PATRICK J. & RHONDA SUSAN FLEMING SHEAHAN
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARTHA ALICE SHEAHAN
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARTHA A. & FORD DIXON III SHEAHAN
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARY AVIS SHEAHAN FULLER
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOSEPH RICHARD SHEAHAN
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: THE ESTATE OF JOHN B. SHEAHAN
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BARBARA F. MANNING, Sr.
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: HEIRS OF DANIEL R. SHEAHAN
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: THE ESTATE OF DANIEL R. SHEAHAN, JR.
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SHEAHAN FAMILY TRUST
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: HEIRS OF PATRICIA ANN WHEATLEY
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BARBARA S. SHEAHAN
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DEANGELO JANE DEANGELO
Represented By: Autumn L. Waters
Represented By: Michael Schneider
Represented By: Kermitt L. Waters
Represented By: Marshall C. Wallace Esquire
Represented By: James J. Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Troy K. Flake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?