Tisha Castillo, et al v. George Johnson, et al
Defendant: ULTRA RACING LLC, ATLAS SOUTHWEST RECREATION COMPANY, SOUTHWEST ENVIRONMENTAL UTILITIES LLC, ATLAS SOUTHWEST INCORPORATED, GHJ INVESTMENTS LLC, ULTRA LEASING LLC, FELIX SOLAR LLC, CENTRAL ARIZONA COMMUNICATIONS LLC, GOLD KEY AVIATION INCORPORATED, SPECIFIC ENGINEERING LLC, OASIS STORAGE SOLUTIONS LLC, 1580 SANTAN MOUNTAIN LLC, ATHENA GROUP LLC and CENTRAL ARIZONA SOLID WASTE INCORPORATED
Defendant / Appellant: DECEMBER COMPANIES, INC., an Arizona corporation, BARJO LLC, an Arizona limited liability company, ROADRUNNER TRANSIT LLC, PINETOP TRUST II, Chris Johnson and Barbara Johnson, as trustees, ULTRA MANAGEMENT LLC, THE GEORGE H. JOHNSON AND JANA S. JOHNSON REVOCABLE TRUST DATED JULY 9, 1987, George and Jana Johnson as trustees, GEORGE HARRY JOHNSON, BARBARA JOHNSON, HUNT MGT LLC, BAJ LIVING TRUST, Barbara A. Johnson as trustee, JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, INC., CHRIS JOHNSON FAMILY TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 14, 2000, Chris and Margaret Johnson as trustees, CHRIS JOHNSON, JOHNSON UTILITIES LLC, MARGARET JOHNSON and JANA JOHNSON, a married couple
Plaintiff / Appellee: TISHA CASTILLO, KAREN CHRISTIAN and STEVE PRATT, on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated
Case Number: 21-15224
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Filing 15 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AC): The unopposed motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief (Docket Entry No. [ # 14 ]) is granted. The answering brief is due May 3, 2021. The optional reply brief remains due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12069051] (WL) [Entered: 04/09/2021 09:25 AM]
April 8, 2021 Filing 14 Filed (ECF) Appellees Tisha Castillo, Karen Christian and Steve Pratt Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 05/03/2021. Date of service: 04/08/2021. [12067480] [21-15224] (Nagy, Brandon) [Entered: 04/08/2021 08:02 AM]
March 25, 2021 Filing 13 Received 6 paper copies of Opening Brief [ # 9 ] filed by Appellants. [12053439] (AML) [Entered: 03/25/2021 01:12 PM]
March 25, 2021 Filing 12 Received 3 paper copies of excerpts of record [ # 10 ] in 2 volume(s) and index volume filed by Appellants. [12053329] (LA) [Entered: 03/25/2021 11:54 AM]
March 22, 2021 Filing 11 Filed clerk order: The opening brief [ # 9 ] submitted by appellants is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 6 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification (attached to the end of each copy of the brief) that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The excerpts of record [ # 10 ] submitted by appellants are filed. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 3 copies of the excerpts in paper format securely bound on the left side, with white covers. The paper copies shall be submitted to the principal office of the Clerk. [12049790] (LA) [Entered: 03/22/2021 04:20 PM]
March 22, 2021 Filing 10 Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellants BAJ Living Trust, BARJO LLC, Chris Johnson Family Trust dated September 14, 2000, December Companies, Inc., Hunt MGT LLC, Johnson International, Inc., Johnson Utilities LLC, Barbara Johnson, Chris Johnson, George Harry Johnson, Jana Johnson, Margaret Johnson, Pinetop Trust II, Roadrunner Transit LLC, The George H. Johnson and Jana S. Johnson Revocable Trust dated July 9, 1987 and Ultra Management LLC. Date of service: 03/22/2021. [12049703] [21-15224] (Fuller, Mark) [Entered: 03/22/2021 03:39 PM]
March 22, 2021 Filing 9 Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellants BAJ Living Trust, BARJO LLC, Chris Johnson Family Trust dated September 14, 2000, December Companies, Inc., Hunt MGT LLC, Johnson International, Inc., Johnson Utilities LLC, Barbara Johnson, Chris Johnson, George Harry Johnson, Jana Johnson, Margaret Johnson, Pinetop Trust II, Roadrunner Transit LLC, The George H. Johnson and Jana S. Johnson Revocable Trust dated July 9, 1987 and Ultra Management LLC. Date of service: 03/22/2021. [12049697] [21-15224] (Fuller, Mark) [Entered: 03/22/2021 03:37 PM]
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: th): Granting Appellant's Unopposed Motion [ # 7 ] (ECF Filing) to extend time to file the opening brief. The appellants' opening brief is due 03/22/2021. The appellees' answering brief is due 04/19/2021 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier. The optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12019198] (TH) [Entered: 03/01/2021 08:52 AM]
February 26, 2021 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) Appellants BAJ Living Trust, BARJO LLC, Chris Johnson Family Trust dated September 14, 2000, December Companies, Inc., Hunt MGT LLC, Barbara Johnson, Chris Johnson, George Harry Johnson, Jana Johnson, Margaret Johnson, Pinetop Trust II, Roadrunner Transit LLC, The George H. Johnson and Jana S. Johnson Revocable Trust dated July 9, 1987 and Ultra Management LLC motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 03/22/2021. Date of service: 02/26/2021. [12017788] [21-15224]--[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 02/26/2021 by SLM] (Fuller, Mark) [Entered: 02/26/2021 10:45 AM]
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/12/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12002292]. [21-15224] (AD) [Entered: 02/12/2021 12:44 PM]
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 02/12/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12002291]. [21-15224] (AD) [Entered: 02/12/2021 12:44 PM]
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellants Johnson International, Inc. and Johnson Utilities LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/12/2021. [12002047] [21-15224] (Beams, Christian) [Entered: 02/12/2021 10:50 AM]
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellants BAJ Living Trust, BARJO LLC, Chris Johnson Family Trust dated September 14, 2000, December Companies, Inc., Hunt MGT LLC, Barbara Johnson, Chris Johnson, George Harry Johnson, Jana Johnson, Margaret Johnson, Pinetop Trust II, Roadrunner Transit LLC, The George H. Johnson and Jana S. Johnson Revocable Trust dated July 9, 1987 and Ultra Management LLC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 02/12/2021. [12001845] [21-15224] (Porter, Hannah) [Entered: 02/12/2021 09:20 AM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed February 8, 2021 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than March 8, 2021; the answering brief is due April 5, 2021 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31- 2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [11998277] (WL) [Entered: 02/09/2021 03:44 PM]
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: To be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal, C.R. 3-3. [11997341] (JBS) [Entered: 02/09/2021 10:00 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Tisha Castillo, et al v. George Johnson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DECEMBER COMPANIES, INC., an Arizona corporation
Represented By: Mark C. Dangerfield Esquire
Represented By: Hannah Porter
Represented By: Mark Andrew Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BARJO LLC, an Arizona limited liability company
Represented By: Mark C. Dangerfield Esquire
Represented By: Hannah Porter
Represented By: Mark Andrew Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ROADRUNNER TRANSIT LLC
Represented By: Mark C. Dangerfield Esquire
Represented By: Hannah Porter
Represented By: Mark Andrew Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PINETOP TRUST II, Chris Johnson and Barbara Johnson, as trustees
Represented By: Mark C. Dangerfield Esquire
Represented By: Hannah Porter
Represented By: Mark Andrew Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ULTRA MANAGEMENT LLC
Represented By: Mark C. Dangerfield Esquire
Represented By: Hannah Porter
Represented By: Mark Andrew Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: THE GEORGE H. JOHNSON AND JANA S. JOHNSON REVOCABLE TRUST DATED JULY 9, 1987, George and Jana Johnson as trustees
Represented By: Mark C. Dangerfield Esquire
Represented By: Hannah Porter
Represented By: Mark Andrew Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GEORGE HARRY JOHNSON
Represented By: Mark C. Dangerfield Esquire
Represented By: Hannah Porter
Represented By: Mark Andrew Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BARBARA JOHNSON
Represented By: Mark C. Dangerfield Esquire
Represented By: Hannah Porter
Represented By: Mark Andrew Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: HUNT MGT LLC
Represented By: Mark C. Dangerfield Esquire
Represented By: Hannah Porter
Represented By: Mark Andrew Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BAJ LIVING TRUST, Barbara A. Johnson as trustee
Represented By: Mark C. Dangerfield Esquire
Represented By: Hannah Porter
Represented By: Mark Andrew Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Daniel E. Fredenberg
Represented By: Christian C.M. Beams Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CHRIS JOHNSON FAMILY TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 14, 2000, Chris and Margaret Johnson as trustees
Represented By: Mark C. Dangerfield Esquire
Represented By: Hannah Porter
Represented By: Mark Andrew Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CHRIS JOHNSON
Represented By: Mark C. Dangerfield Esquire
Represented By: Hannah Porter
Represented By: Mark Andrew Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOHNSON UTILITIES LLC
Represented By: Daniel E. Fredenberg
Represented By: Christian C.M. Beams Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARGARET JOHNSON
Represented By: Mark C. Dangerfield Esquire
Represented By: Hannah Porter
Represented By: Mark Andrew Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JANA JOHNSON, a married couple
Represented By: Mark C. Dangerfield Esquire
Represented By: Hannah Porter
Represented By: Mark Andrew Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ULTRA RACING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLAS SOUTHWEST RECREATION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHWEST ENVIRONMENTAL UTILITIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLAS SOUTHWEST INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHJ INVESTMENTS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ULTRA LEASING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FELIX SOLAR LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL ARIZONA COMMUNICATIONS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOLD KEY AVIATION INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECIFIC ENGINEERING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OASIS STORAGE SOLUTIONS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1580 SANTAN MOUNTAIN LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATHENA GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL ARIZONA SOLID WASTE INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TISHA CASTILLO
Represented By: Stefan M. Palys Esquire
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Goulder Esquire
Represented By: Brandon R. Nagy
Represented By: Clinton A. Krislov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KAREN CHRISTIAN
Represented By: Stefan M. Palys Esquire
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Goulder Esquire
Represented By: Brandon R. Nagy
Represented By: Clinton A. Krislov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STEVE PRATT, on behalf of themselves and others similarly situated
Represented By: Stefan M. Palys Esquire
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Goulder Esquire
Represented By: Brandon R. Nagy
Represented By: Clinton A. Krislov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?