Daniel Gonzalez, et al v. Gregory Ahern, et al
Plaintiff: DANIEL TORRES, ARTEMIO GONZALEZ, TROY POWELL and CEDRIC HENRY
Plaintiff / Appellant: ROCCI GARRETT, MICHAEL DION LUCAS, DANIEL GONZALEZ, LAWRENCE J. GERRANS, SERGIO MORALES-SERVIN, on behalf of himself and others similarly situated, as a class, and subclass and MARTIN GALLARDO
Defendant / Appellee: WELL-PATH MANAGEMENT, INC., a Delaware Corporation, FKA California Forensic Medical Group, IGNONT, Deputy, DENNIS HOUGHTELLING, JOE, Deputy, ALAMEDA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, THOMAS F. MADIGAN, KAISER, Technician, LUCKETT-FAHIMA, Captain, GREGORY J. AHERN, ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC, a Delawae Limtied Liability Company; its employees and sub-contactors, DERRICK C. DERRICK and COUNTY OF ALAMEDA
Case Number: 21-15485
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Filing 20 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 06/10/2021, 11:00 a.m., Pacific Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows :Appellants Martin Gallardo, Rocci Garrett, Lawrence J. Gerrans, Daniel Gonzalez, Michael Dion Lucas and Sergio Morales-Servin opening brief due 07/12/2021. Appellees Gregory J. Ahern, Alameda County Sheriff's Office, Aramark Correctional Services, LLC, County of Alameda, Derrick C. Derrick, Dennis Houghtelling, Ignont, Joe, Kaiser, Luckett-Fahima, Thomas F. Madigan and Well-Path Management, Inc. answering brief due 08/11/2021. Appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days afer service of the answering brief. See order for details. [12107974] (VS) [Entered: 05/10/2021 02:50 PM]
May 6, 2021 Filing 19 Filed (ECF) Appellees Alameda County Sheriff's Office, County of Alameda and Ignont Motion for miscellaneous relief [Appellee"s Motion for Leave to Withdraw Motion to Dismiss Filed On April 29, 2021 (Dkt. 17)]. Date of service: 05/06/2021. [12105071] [21-15485] (Belaga, Jonathan) [Entered: 05/06/2021 03:47 PM]
April 30, 2021 Filing 18 Filed (ECF) Appellants Martin Gallardo, Rocci Garrett, Lawrence J. Gerrans, Daniel Gonzalez, Michael Dion Lucas and Sergio Morales-Servin response opposing motion ([ # 17 ] Motion (ECF Filing), [ # 17 ] Motion (ECF Filing) motion to dismiss case for failure to prosecute under Circuit Rule 42-1). Date of service: 04/30/2021. [12099002] [21-15485] (Huang, Yolanda) [Entered: 04/30/2021 06:20 PM]
April 29, 2021 Filing 17 Filed (ECF) Appellees Alameda County Sheriff's Office, County of Alameda, Ignont and Joe Motion to dismiss case for failure to prosecute (Cir. Rule 42-1). Date of service: 04/29/2021. [12096654] [21-15485] (Belaga, Jonathan) [Entered: 04/29/2021 10:27 AM]
April 27, 2021 Filing 16 Terminated Bear Allen-Blaine for Daniel Gonzalez in 21-15485 [12087954] (NAC) [Entered: 04/27/2021 09:35 AM]
April 27, 2021 Filing 15 Filed (ECF) Notice of withdrawal of counsel. Filed by Attorney Bear Allen-Blaine for Appellant Daniel Gonzalez. Party proceeding without counsel: No. Date of service: 04/27/2021. [12087940] [21-15485] (Allen-Blaine, Bear) [Entered: 04/27/2021 09:33 AM]
April 26, 2021 Filing 14 Added Attorney(s) Bear Allen-Blaine for party(s) Appellant Daniel Gonzalez. [12086379] (RL) [Entered: 04/26/2021 10:50 AM]
April 26, 2021 Filing 13 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Berangere Allen-Blaine (The Appellate Law Firm, 3680 Wilshire Blvd., Ste. P04-1207, Los Angeles, CA 90010) for Appellant Daniel Gonzalez. Date of service: 04/26/2021. (Party was previously proceeding pro se.) [12086226] [21-15485] (Allen-Blaine, Bear) [Entered: 04/26/2021 09:45 AM]
April 16, 2021 Filing 12 Terminated Lynn L. Krieger for Aramark Correctional Services, LLC in 21-15485 (due to incorrect ECF account information). [12077874] (SLM) [Entered: 04/16/2021 03:59 PM]
April 16, 2021 Filing 11 MEDIATION CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 05/10/2021, 2:00 p.m. Pacific Time. (originally scheduled on 04/29/2021 ). [12077757] (VS) [Entered: 04/16/2021 03:20 PM]
April 6, 2021 Filing 10 Filed order MEDIATION (VS): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. The court has scheduled a dial-in telephone assessment conference with counsel and Circuit Mediator Roxane Ashe at the date and time indicated above to explore settlement potential. Each attorney on the attached list of participants will receive an email with dial-in information. If there are any changes or additions to the list, please notify the Mediation Office at mediation@ca9.uscourts.gov. ... The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellants' opening brief is due May 28, 2021; appellees' answering brief is due June 28, 2021; appellants' optional reply brief is due within 21 days from the service date of the answering brief (SEE ORDER FOR FULL TEXT). [12065431] (JPD) [Entered: 04/06/2021 02:17 PM]
March 25, 2021 Filing 9 Terminated Jemma Parker Saunders for Well-Path Management, Inc. in 21-15485 (due to incorrect ECF contact information) [12053819] (RY) [Entered: 03/25/2021 04:21 PM]
March 22, 2021 Filing 8 Filed order MEDIATION (VLS): The Mediation Program of the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See Fed. R. App. P. 33 and Ninth Cir. R. 33-1. By April 5, 2021, counsel for all parties intending to file briefs in this matter are requested to inform Roxane Ashe, Circuit Mediator, by email at roxane_ashe@ca9.uscourts.gov, of their clients views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be appropriate for settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. Counsel are requested to include the Ninth Circuit case name and number in the subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, from the other parties in the case. This communication shall not be filed with the court. For more detailed information about the Mediation Program and its procedures generally, please see Mediation Program web site: www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. [12049443] (JPD) [Entered: 03/22/2021 02:10 PM]
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/22/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12049173]. [21-15485] (AD) [Entered: 03/22/2021 12:44 PM]
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 Filed (ECF) Appellees Gregory J. Ahern, Alameda County Sheriff's Office, Derrick C. Derrick, Dennis Houghtelling, Ignont, Joe, Doctor Kaiser, Luckett-Fahima, Thomas F. Madigan and County of Alameda Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/22/2021. [12048858] [21-15485] (Belaga, Jonathan) [Entered: 03/22/2021 11:02 AM]
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TSP): The appeal filed March 13, 2021, is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. The mediation questionnaire is due three days after the date of this order. If they have not already done so, within 7 calendar days after the filing date of this order, the parties shall make arrangements to obtain from the court reporter an official transcript of proceedings in the district court that will be included in the record on appeal. The briefing schedule shall proceed as follows: the opening brief and excerpts of record are due not later than April 12, 2021; the answering brief is due May 10, 2021 or 28 days after service of the opening brief, whichever is earlier; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. See 9th Cir. R. 3-3(b). No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). Failure to file timely the opening brief shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [12046677] (JPD) [Entered: 03/18/2021 04:35 PM]
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [12046094] (NAC) [Entered: 03/18/2021 01:28 PM]
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 03/18/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12046005]. [21-15485] (AD) [Entered: 03/18/2021 12:44 PM]
March 18, 2021 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Daniel Gonzalez Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/18/2021. [12045989] [21-15485] (Huang, Yolanda) [Entered: 03/18/2021 12:38 PM]
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: to be set. Preliminary Injunction. C.R. 3-3. [12045850] (RT) [Entered: 03/18/2021 11:18 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Daniel Gonzalez, et al v. Gregory Ahern, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROCCI GARRETT
Represented By: Dennis Cunningham
Represented By: Yolanda Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL DION LUCAS
Represented By: Dennis Cunningham
Represented By: Yolanda Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DANIEL GONZALEZ
Represented By: Dennis Cunningham
Represented By: Yolanda Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LAWRENCE J. GERRANS
Represented By: Dennis Cunningham
Represented By: Yolanda Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SERGIO MORALES-SERVIN, on behalf of himself and others similarly situated, as a class, and subclass
Represented By: Dennis Cunningham
Represented By: Yolanda Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARTIN GALLARDO
Represented By: Dennis Cunningham
Represented By: Yolanda Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WELL-PATH MANAGEMENT, INC., a Delaware Corporation, FKA California Forensic Medical Group
Represented By: Jemma Parker Saunders
Represented By: Peter G. Bertling Esquire
Represented By: Peter G. Bertling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: IGNONT, Deputy
Represented By: Jonathan Jeremy Belaga
Represented By: Wendy Wilcox Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENNIS HOUGHTELLING
Represented By: Jonathan Jeremy Belaga
Represented By: Wendy Wilcox Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOE, Deputy
Represented By: Jonathan Jeremy Belaga
Represented By: Wendy Wilcox Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALAMEDA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Represented By: Jonathan Jeremy Belaga
Represented By: Wendy Wilcox Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS F. MADIGAN
Represented By: Jonathan Jeremy Belaga
Represented By: Wendy Wilcox Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAISER, Technician
Represented By: Jonathan Jeremy Belaga
Represented By: Wendy Wilcox Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LUCKETT-FAHIMA, Captain
Represented By: Jonathan Jeremy Belaga
Represented By: Wendy Wilcox Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREGORY J. AHERN
Represented By: Jonathan Jeremy Belaga
Represented By: Wendy Wilcox Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ARAMARK CORRECTIONAL SERVICES, LLC, a Delawae Limtied Liability Company; its employees and sub-contactors
Represented By: Lynn Krieger
Represented By: Susan Faye Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DERRICK C. DERRICK
Represented By: Jonathan Jeremy Belaga
Represented By: Wendy Wilcox Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTY OF ALAMEDA
Represented By: Jonathan Jeremy Belaga
Represented By: Wendy Wilcox Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL TORRES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTEMIO GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TROY POWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CEDRIC HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?