Tanya Winters v. Andrew Saul
Defendant / Appellee: ANDREW M. SAUL, Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff / Appellant: TANYA WINTERS
Case Number: 21-15493
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Filing 9 Filed Appellant Tanya Winters motion to extend time. Deficiencies: None. [12109312] (NAC) [Entered: 05/11/2021 01:43 PM]
May 11, 2021 Filing 8 Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Tanya Winters 3rd opening brief of 6 pages (Informal: No). Served on 05/11/2021. Major deficiency: case is closed. [12109190] (KWG) [Entered: 05/11/2021 01:00 PM]
May 10, 2021 Filing 13 Filed Appellant Tanya Winters motion for all out of pocket medical paid for June 1998. Deficiencies: None [12109331] (NAC) [Entered: 05/11/2021 01:49 PM]
May 10, 2021 Filing 12 Filed Appellant Tanya Winters motion for current workers disability benefits. Deficiencies: None. [12109326] (NAC) [Entered: 05/11/2021 01:47 PM]
May 10, 2021 Filing 11 Filed Appellant Tanya Winters motion for correctly given disability workers. Deficiencies: None [12109322] (NAC) [Entered: 05/11/2021 01:45 PM]
May 10, 2021 Filing 10 Filed Appellant Tanya Winters motion for all incorrectly held child support garnishments. Deficiencies: None [12109318] (NAC) [Entered: 05/11/2021 01:44 PM]
April 20, 2021 Filing 7 Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Tanya Winters opening brief of 3 pages (Informal: No). Served on 04/20/2021. Major deficiency: case is closed. [12080877] (KWG) [Entered: 04/20/2021 01:20 PM]
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 Filed order (RICHARD R. CLIFTON, MARY H. MURGUIA and DANIEL A. BRESS) : A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the March 1, 2021 order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See WMX Techs., Inc. v. Miller, 104 F.3d 1133, 1136 (9th Cir. 1997) (en banc) (dismissal of complaint with leave to amend is not appealable). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. All pending motions are denied as moot. DISMISSED. [12076194] (RT) [Entered: 04/15/2021 03:38 PM]
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 Received original and 0 copies of Appellant Tanya Winters opening brief of 4 pages (pages 2, 4, and 6 are missing) (Informal: Yes). Served on 04/01/2021. Major deficiency: briefing is stayed (IFP motion and motion to appoint counsel are pending). [12066836] (LA) [Entered: 04/07/2021 03:02 PM]
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 Filed Appellant Tanya Winters motion to grant workers disability. Deficiencies: None [12066720] (NAC) [Entered: 04/07/2021 02:19 PM]
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Tanya Winters motion to appoint pro bono counsel. Deficiencies: None. [12066710] (NAC) [Entered: 04/07/2021 02:17 PM]
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 Filed Appellant Tanya Winters motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [12063830] (NAC) [Entered: 04/05/2021 02:08 PM]
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEE. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Tanya Winters opening brief due 05/14/2021. [12047263] (JMR) [Entered: 03/19/2021 10:24 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Tanya Winters v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDREW M. SAUL, Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TANYA WINTERS
Represented By: Tanya Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?