Juan Alcaraz v. Brian Williams, et al
Respondent / Appellee: BRIAN WILLIAMS, Warden and ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE STATE OF NEVADA
Petitioner / Appellant: JUAN M. ALCARAZ
Case Number: 21-15930
Filed: May 28, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 Criminal Justice Act electronic voucher created. (Counsel: Ms. Angela H. Dows, Esquire for Juan M. Alcaraz) [12159758] (TG) [Entered: 06/30/2021 05:02 PM]
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant Juan M. Alcaraz Motion for certificate of appealability. Date of service: 06/28/2021. [12156836] [21-15930] (Dows, Angela) [Entered: 06/28/2021 05:49 PM]
May 28, 2021 Filing 1 Open 9th Circuit docket: needs certificate of appealability. Date COA denied in DC: 05/24/2021. Record on appeal included: Yes. [12127817] (WL) [Entered: 05/28/2021 09:48 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Juan Alcaraz v. Brian Williams, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: BRIAN WILLIAMS, Warden
Represented By: Heather D. Procter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE STATE OF NEVADA
Represented By: Heather D. Procter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JUAN M. ALCARAZ
Represented By: Angela H. Dows Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?