The Bank of New York Mellon v. Maria Loyo-Morales, et al
Defendant: KIMBERLY TIBONI, NORTHGATE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION and NEVADA ASSOCIATION SERVICES, INC.
Defendant / Appellant: MARIA LOYO-MORALES
Plaintiff / Appellee: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates,Series 2005-13, FKA The Bank of New York
Case Number: 21-16041
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 23, 2022 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON V. MARIA LOYO-MORALES

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12195984] (CL) [Entered: 08/09/2021 02:37 PM]
July 26, 2021 Filing 7 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Conference, 08/09/2021, 11:30 a.m. Pacific Time. See order for details. [12183579] (CL) [Entered: 07/26/2021 05:47 PM]
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 07/26/2021, 10:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12168384] (CL) [Entered: 07/09/2021 02:12 PM]
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/30/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12159124]. [21-16041] (AD) [Entered: 06/30/2021 12:44 PM]
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Maria Loyo-Morales Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/30/2021. [12158971] [21-16041] (Shafer, Jay) [Entered: 06/30/2021 11:11 AM]
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 Added Attorney(s) Jay A. Shafer for party(s) Appellant Maria Loyo-Morales, in case 21-16041. [12158111] (JFF) [Entered: 06/29/2021 03:21 PM]
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jay A. Shafer, Esq. (Cory Reade Dows & Shafer) for Appellant Maria Loyo-Morales. Date of service: 06/29/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12158079] [21-16041] (Shafer, Jay) [Entered: 06/29/2021 03:13 PM]
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Maria Loyo-Morales Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/24/2021. Transcript ordered by 07/16/2021. Transcript due 08/16/2021. Appellant Maria Loyo-Morales opening brief due 09/24/2021. Appellee The Bank of New York Mellon answering brief due 10/25/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12147340] (JBS) [Entered: 06/17/2021 01:33 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: The Bank of New York Mellon v. Maria Loyo-Morales, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARIA LOYO-MORALES
Represented By: Robert Christopher Reade Esquire
Represented By: Jay A. Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates,Series 2005-13, FKA The Bank of New York
Represented By: Scott Lachman
Represented By: Natalie L. Winslow Esquire
Represented By: Ariel Edward Stern Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY TIBONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHGATE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEVADA ASSOCIATION SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?