Javier Martinez v. Lowell Clark, et al
Respondent / Appellee: NATHALIE ASHER, Tacoma Field Office Director, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General, CHAD F. WOLF, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security and LOWELL CLARK, Warden, Northwest Detention Center
Petitioner / Appellant: JAVIER MARTINEZ
Case Number: 21-35023
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Filing 6 Streamlined request [5] by Appellant Javier Martinez to extend time to file the brief is not approved because it is unnecessary. The briefing schedule is stayed. See 9th Cir. R. 27-11. [12028963] (BG) [Entered: 03/09/2021 09:58 AM]
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Javier Martinez. New requested due date is 04/08/2021. [12027611] [21-35023] (Pauw, Robert) [Entered: 03/08/2021 12:29 PM]
March 5, 2021 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant Javier Martinez Motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Date of service: 03/05/2021. [12026716] [21-35023] (Pauw, Robert) [Entered: 03/05/2021 05:15 PM]
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 Received copy of District Court minute order filed on 02/05/2021: Motion for Reconsideration is Denied. [11994894] (HH) [Entered: 02/05/2021 04:01 PM]
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 Received copy of District Court minute order filed on 02/02/2021. Petitioner's motion for leave to appeal IFP is denied. The Court certifies that Petitioner's appeal is not taken in good faith. [11989845] (RR) [Entered: 02/02/2021 12:44 PM]
January 11, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Javier Martinez opening brief due 03/09/2021. Appellees Nathalie Asher, William P. Barr, Attorney General, Lowell Clark and Chad F. Wolf answering brief due 04/09/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11959135] (RT) [Entered: 01/11/2021 01:34 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Javier Martinez v. Lowell Clark, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: NATHALIE ASHER, Tacoma Field Office Director, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Dana Michelle Camilleri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General
Represented By: Dana Michelle Camilleri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: CHAD F. WOLF, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Dana Michelle Camilleri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: LOWELL CLARK, Warden, Northwest Detention Center
Represented By: Dana Michelle Camilleri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JAVIER MARTINEZ
Represented By: Robert Pauw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?