Hamid Hejazi v. Mark Esper, et al
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, MARK T. ESPER, Secretary, Department of the Army and U.S. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
Plaintiff / Appellant: HAMID MICHAEL HEJAZI
Case Number: 21-35096
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Filing 6 Filed Appellant Hamid Michael Hejazi motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [12010198] (NAC) [Entered: 02/19/2021 03:26 PM]
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Hamid Michael Hejazi EMERGENCY motion to stay appellate proceedings. Deficiencies: None. [12010191] (NAC) [Entered: 02/19/2021 03:25 PM]
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 Filed order (WILLIAM C. CANBY, SUSAN P. GRABER and MICHELLE T. FRIEDLAND) : A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; In re San Vicente Med. Partners Ltd., 865 F.2d 1128, 1131 (9th Cir. 1989) (order) (magistrate judge order not final or appealable). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. DISMISSED. [12005472] (RT) [Entered: 02/16/2021 05:39 PM]
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 Sent: Appellant Hamid Michael Hejazi copy of FRAP Rules and Fee waiver application. [ # 2 ] [11994276] (ER) [Entered: 02/05/2021 11:53 AM]
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 Received Appellant Hamid Michael Hejazi request for copy of FRAP Rules and Fee waiver application. [11993255] (NAC) [Entered: 02/04/2021 03:03 PM]
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Hamid Michael Hejazi opening brief due 04/05/2021. [11992546] (JBS) [Entered: 02/04/2021 10:14 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Hamid Hejazi v. Mark Esper, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK T. ESPER, Secretary, Department of the Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HAMID MICHAEL HEJAZI
Represented By: Hamid Michael Hejazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?