Jory Strizich v. Lynn Guyer, et al
Defendant / Appellee: KRISTY COBBAN, LYNN GUYER, SCOTT MCNIEL, TERI GOCHANOUR, JAMES MILLIGAN, JIM SALMONSEN, BILLIE REICH and D. J. GODFREY
Plaintiff / Appellant: JORY STRIZICH
Case Number: 21-35459
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Filing 7 Filed order (Deputy Clerk: DA) A review of the docket reflects that appellant has not timely filed the opening brief or a completed prisoner authorization form in compliance with the courts July 2, 2021 order. The July 2, 2021 order warned appellant that failure to comply would result in the automatic dismissal of the appeal by the Clerk of the Court. Accordingly, this appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Appellants motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 6 ]) for voluntary dismissal is denied as moot and because it requests dismissal without prejudice. A request for voluntary dismissal must be with prejudice except as provided in the courts General Orders, Appendix A(27). This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as and for the mandate of this court. [12193257] (OC) [Entered: 08/05/2021 02:40 PM]
July 26, 2021 Filing 6 Filed Appellant Jory Strizich motion to dismiss. Deficiencies: None. Served on 07/15/2021. [12183776] (RL) [Entered: 07/27/2021 09:12 AM]
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Jory Strizich reply motion to expedite [12174979] (JFF) [Entered: 07/16/2021 02:31 PM]
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: DA): The appeal filed June 15, 2021 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, the briefing deadlines for preliminary injunction appeals set forth in Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 apply. Appellants motion to further expedite the briefing schedule (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]) is denied. The briefing schedule is established as follows: appellants opening brief is due July 15, 2021; appellees answering brief is due August 12, 2021; and appellants optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. The appeal and any motions pending at the time briefing is completed will be referred to the next available motions panel for disposition. No streamlined extensions of time will be approved. See 9th Cir. R. 31-2.2(a)(3). Any request for an extension of time to file a brief must be made by written motion under Ninth Circuit Rule 31-2.2(b). A review of the district court docket reflects that appellant was permitted to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court, and that such permission has not been revoked to date. Consequently, appellant's forma pauperis status continues in this court. Fed. R. App. P. 24(a). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1) and (2), however, appellant must pay the full amount of the filing and docketing fees for this appeal when funds are available in appellant's account. Consequently, within 21 days after the filing date of this order, appellant shall complete and file with this court the enclosed authorization form, which directs the prison officials at appellant's institution to assess, collect, and forward to the court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal on a monthly basis whenever funds exist in appellant's trust fund account. These fees will continue to be collected regardless of the date or manner of disposition of this appeal. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2) and (e)(2). Appellant is not responsible for payment when the funds in appellants prison trust account total less than $10.00, but payments must resume when additional deposits are made or funds are otherwise available. Failure to file timely the opening brief and return a completed prisoner authorization form shall result in the automatic dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [12162247] (AF) [Entered: 07/02/2021 04:16 PM]
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) Appellees Kristy Cobban, Teri Gochanour, D. J. Godfrey, Lynn Guyer, Scott McNiel, James Milligan, Billie Reich and Jim Salmonsen response to motion ([ # 2 ] Party Motion). Date of service: 06/30/2021. [12159115] [21-35459] (Cziok, Andrew) [Entered: 06/30/2021 12:42 PM]
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 Filed Appellant Jory Strizich motion to expedite briefing. Deficiencies: None. Served on 06/23/2021. [12158273] (RL) [Entered: 06/29/2021 04:02 PM]
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows:to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. C.R. 3-3. [12145753] (RT) [Entered: 06/16/2021 10:08 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jory Strizich v. Lynn Guyer, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KRISTY COBBAN
Represented By: Andrew Cziok
Represented By: Lindsey R. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LYNN GUYER
Represented By: Andrew Cziok
Represented By: Lindsey R. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT MCNIEL
Represented By: Andrew Cziok
Represented By: Lindsey R. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TERI GOCHANOUR
Represented By: Andrew Cziok
Represented By: Lindsey R. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES MILLIGAN
Represented By: Andrew Cziok
Represented By: Lindsey R. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JIM SALMONSEN
Represented By: Andrew Cziok
Represented By: Lindsey R. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BILLIE REICH
Represented By: Andrew Cziok
Represented By: Lindsey R. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: D. J. GODFREY
Represented By: Andrew Cziok
Represented By: Lindsey R. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JORY STRIZICH
Represented By: Jory Strizich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?