Stephen Johnson, et al v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: PAULA A. JOHNSON and STEPHEN H. JOHNSON
Defendant / Appellee: CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC., DOES, 1-10, inclusive and U.S. BANK, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Case Number: 21-55208
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Filing 6 Filed original and 7 copies of Appellants Paula A. Johnson and Stephen H. Johnson opening brief of 23 pages (Informal: Yes). Served on 05/03/2021. [12104178] (KWG) [Entered: 05/06/2021 09:58 AM]
March 30, 2021 Filing 5 Attorneys Simon Feng and Simon Feng in 21-55208 substituted by Attorneys James Christopher Magid and James Christopher Magid in 21-55208 [12057814] (DJV) [Entered: 03/30/2021 09:38 AM]
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of James C. Magid (Locke Lord LLP, 101 Montgomery Street, Suite 1950, San Francisco, CA 94104) for Appellees Caliber Home Loans, Inc. and U.S. Bank, N.A.. Substitution for Attorney Simon Feng for Appellees Caliber Home Loans, Inc. and U.S. Bank, N.A.. Date of service: 03/30/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12057772] [21-55208] (Magid, James) [Entered: 03/30/2021 09:21 AM]
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 03/24/2021. [12051757] (BY) [Entered: 03/24/2021 10:18 AM]
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [12030248] (CKP) [Entered: 03/10/2021 12:24 AM]
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANTS. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Paula A. Johnson and Stephen H. Johnson opening brief due 05/03/2021. Appellees Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Does and U.S. Bank, N.A. answering brief due 06/02/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12027150] (JBS) [Entered: 03/08/2021 09:49 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Stephen Johnson, et al v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAULA A. JOHNSON
Represented By: Paula A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEPHEN H. JOHNSON
Represented By: Stephen H. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC.
Represented By: Simon Feng
Represented By: Nina Huerta Esquire
Represented By: James Christopher Magid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES, 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. BANK, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Simon Feng
Represented By: Nina Huerta Esquire
Represented By: James Christopher Magid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?