San Luis Obispo Coastkeeper, et al v. Santa Maria Valley Water Conse, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: LOS PADRES FORESTWATCH and SAN LUIS OBISPO COASTKEEPER
Defendant / Appellee: SANTA MARIA VALLEY WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT, SANTA MARIA VALLEY WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT BOARD OF DIRECTORS, UNITED STATES BUREAU OF RECLAMATION, BRENDA BURMAN, Commissioner of the United States Bureau of Reclamation and U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Intervenor Defendant / Appellee: CITY OF SANTA MARIA and GOLDEN STATE WATER COMPANY
Case Number: 21-55479
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 23, 2022 Summary SAN LUIS OBISPO COASTKEEPER, ET AL V. SANTA MARIA VALLEY WATER CONSE, ET AL

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 11 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. All further inquiries regarding this appeal, including request for extensions of time, should be directed to the Clerk's Office. Counsel are requested to contact the Circuit Mediator should circumstances develop that warrant settlement discussions while the appeal is pending. [12138669] (VS) [Entered: 06/09/2021 10:46 AM]
June 7, 2021 Filing 10 Added Attorney(s) Kevin William McArdle for party(s) Appellee Brenda Burman Appellee USDOI Appellee United States Bureau of Reclamation, in case 21-55479. [12136245] (JFF) [Entered: 06/07/2021 02:54 PM]
June 7, 2021 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kevin W. McArdle (U.S. Department of Justice, Environment and Natural Resources Division, Post Office Box 7415, Washington, D.C. 20044) for Appellees Brenda Burman, USDOI and United States Bureau of Reclamation. Date of service: 06/07/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12135752] [21-55479] (McArdle, Kevin) [Entered: 06/07/2021 12:08 PM]
May 18, 2021 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 06/01/2021, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12116835] (VS) [Entered: 05/18/2021 01:20 PM]
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 Terminated Jason Robert Flanders for Los Padres Forestwatch in 21-55479, Erica A. Maharg for Los Padres Forestwatch in 21-55479 [12116295] (BY) [Entered: 05/18/2021 10:01 AM]
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 Added Attorney(s) Linda Krop, Daniel Cooper for party(s) Appellant Los Padres Forestwatch Appellant San Luis Obispo Coastkeeper, in case 21-55479. [12116268] (BY) [Entered: 05/18/2021 09:50 AM]
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 Added Attorney(s) Margaret Morgan Hall for party(s) Appellant Los Padres Forestwatch, in case 21-55479. [12116252] (BY) [Entered: 05/18/2021 09:45 AM]
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellee Santa Maria Valley Water Conservation District Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/17/2021. [12115578] [21-55479] (Juarez, Mario) [Entered: 05/17/2021 03:01 PM]
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 05/17/2021. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12115207]. [21-55479] (AD) [Entered: 05/17/2021 12:44 PM]
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants San Luis Obispo Coastkeeper and Los Padres Forestwatch Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 05/17/2021. [12115189] [21-55479] (Flanders, Jason) [Entered: 05/17/2021 12:31 PM]
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Los Padres Forestwatch and San Luis Obispo Coastkeeper Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/17/2021. Transcript ordered by 06/07/2021. Transcript due 07/06/2021. Appellants Los Padres Forestwatch and San Luis Obispo Coastkeeper opening brief due 08/16/2021. Appellees Brenda Burman, City of Santa Maria, Golden State Water Company, Santa Maria Valley Water Conservation District, Santa Maria Valley Water Conservation District Board of Directors, U.S. Department of the Interior and United States Bureau of Reclamation answering brief due 09/16/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12108145] (RT) [Entered: 05/10/2021 03:46 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: San Luis Obispo Coastkeeper, et al v. Santa Maria Valley Water Conse, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LOS PADRES FORESTWATCH
Represented By: Jason Robert Flanders
Represented By: Erica A. Maharg
Represented By: Margaret Morgan Hall
Represented By: Linda Krop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SAN LUIS OBISPO COASTKEEPER
Represented By: Jason Robert Flanders
Represented By: Erica A. Maharg
Represented By: Daniel Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANTA MARIA VALLEY WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT
Represented By: Mario A. Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SANTA MARIA VALLEY WATER CONSERVATION DISTRICT BOARD OF DIRECTORS
Represented By: Mario A. Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES BUREAU OF RECLAMATION
Represented By: Bridget McNeil
Represented By: Kevin William McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRENDA BURMAN, Commissioner of the United States Bureau of Reclamation
Represented By: Bridget McNeil
Represented By: Kevin William McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By: Bridget McNeil
Represented By: Kevin William McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellee: CITY OF SANTA MARIA
Represented By: Amy Steinfeld
Represented By: Jeffrey Vincent Dunn Esquire
Represented By: Thomas T. Watson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellee: GOLDEN STATE WATER COMPANY
Represented By: Amy Steinfeld
Represented By: Jeffrey Vincent Dunn Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?