Kavin Rhodes v. Christian Pfeiffer
Petitioner / Appellant: KAVIN MAURICE RHODES
Respondent / Appellee: CHRISTIAN PFEIFFER, Warden, Warden, in individual capacity
Case Number: 21-55870
Filed: August 13, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
October 31, 2022 KAVIN RHODES V. CHRISTIAN PFEIFFER
December 16, 2022 KAVIN RHODES V. CHRISTIAN PFEIFFER

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 6 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AT): Pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 22-1(e), appellants motion to broaden the certificate of appealability (Docket Entry No. [ # 5 ]) is denied without prejudice to raising any uncertified issues in the opening brief. [I]f a petitioner concludes during the course of preparing the opening brief on certified issues that an uncertified issue should be discussed in the brief, the petitioner shall first brief all certified issues under the heading Certified Issues and then, in the same brief, shall discuss any uncertified issues under the heading Uncertified Issues. Uncertified issues raised and designated in this manner will be treated as a motion to expand the COA and will be addressed by the merits panel to such extent as it deems appropriate. 9th Cir. R. 22-1(e). The existing briefing schedule remains in effect. Because appellant is proceeding without counsel, appellant is not required to file excerpts of record. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.3. [12244393] (JBS) [Entered: 09/30/2021 04:10 PM]
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Kavin Maurice Rhodes motion to expand certificate of appealability. Deficiencies: None. Served on 08/27/2021. [12220497] (QDL) [Entered: 09/03/2021 04:00 PM]
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 Attorney Idan Ivri in 21-55870 substituted by Attorney Herbert S. Tetef in 21-55870 [12212005] (QDL) [Entered: 08/26/2021 08:40 AM]
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Herbert S. Tetef (Office of the California Attorney General, 300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702, Los Angeles, California 90013) for Appellee Christian Pfeiffer. Substitution for Attorney Idan Ivri for Appellee Christian Pfeiffer. Date of service: 08/26/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12211993] [21-55870] (Tetef, Herbert) [Entered: 08/26/2021 08:35 AM]
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 Received Appellant Kavin Maurice Rhodes notice of appeal. [12204028] (QDL) [Entered: 08/17/2021 03:23 PM]
August 13, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 09/09/2021. Transcript due 10/12/2021. Appellant Kavin Maurice Rhodes opening brief due 11/18/2021. Appellee Christian Pfeiffer, Warden answering brief due 12/20/2021. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12200664] (OC) [Entered: 08/13/2021 10:12 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kavin Rhodes v. Christian Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: KAVIN MAURICE RHODES
Represented By: Kavin Maurice Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: CHRISTIAN PFEIFFER, Warden, Warden, in individual capacity
Represented By: Idan Ivri
Represented By: Shira S. Markovich
Represented By: Herbert S. Tetef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?