Latwahn McElroy v. Does, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: LATWAHN MCELROY, AKA E. J. McElroy, AKA Jabbari McElroy, AKA Jarbor McElroy
Defendant / Appellee: DOES, RN/DA, R&R Medical Technician, Doctors Assistant and Supervisors, DOE, Medical Admin., Supervisor of Due Process Requirements, R&R PROPERTY ROOM CLERK AND SUPERVISOR, Richard J. Donovan Correctional Facility Legal property Room, BUENAROSTRO, Correctional Officer, DOE, Correctional Officer and CDCR LAW LIBRARY
Case Number: 21-55910
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Filing 3 MANDATE ISSUED. (MDH, PJW and KKL) [12253205] (DJV) [Entered: 10/12/2021 07:38 AM]
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 Filed order (MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS, PAUL J. WATFORD and KENNETH K. LEE): A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the notice of appeal, served on June 13, 2021 and filed on June 17, 2021, was not filed or delivered to prison officials within 30 days after the district courts judgment entered on October 31, 2017. See 28 U.S.C. 2107(a); United States v. Sadler, 480 F.3d 932, 937 (9th Cir. 2007) (requirement of timely notice of appeal is jurisdictional). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. DISMISSED. [12233689] (AF) [Entered: 09/20/2021 03:32 PM]
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Latwahn McElroy opening brief due 10/25/2021. [12211116]--[Edited: attached correct PDF of docketing letter and briefing schedule. 08/25/2021 by SLM] (JPD) [Entered: 08/25/2021 11:11 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Latwahn McElroy v. Does, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LATWAHN MCELROY, AKA E. J. McElroy, AKA Jabbari McElroy, AKA Jarbor McElroy
Represented By: Latwahn McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOES, RN/DA, R&R Medical Technician, Doctors Assistant and Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOE, Medical Admin., Supervisor of Due Process Requirements
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R&R PROPERTY ROOM CLERK AND SUPERVISOR, Richard J. Donovan Correctional Facility Legal property Room
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BUENAROSTRO, Correctional Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOE, Correctional Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CDCR LAW LIBRARY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?