USA v. Elizabeth Holmes
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant / Appellant: ELIZABETH A. HOLMES
Case Number: 22-10312
Filed: December 2, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2023 Filing 12 Streamlined request [11] by Appellant Elizabeth A. Holmes to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant briefs and excerpts due by 04/03/2023 for Elizabeth A. Holmes. Appellee brief due 05/03/2023 for United States of America. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12632332] (DLM) [Entered: 01/18/2023 08:08 AM]
January 17, 2023 Filing 11 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Elizabeth A. Holmes. New requested due date is 04/03/2023. [12632126] [22-10312] (Saharia, Amy) [Entered: 01/17/2023 04:36 PM]
December 27, 2022 Filing 10 Added Attorney(s) Katherine A. Trefz for party(s) Appellant Elizabeth A. Holmes, in case 22-10312. [12617714] (NAC) [Entered: 12/27/2022 07:52 AM]
December 27, 2022 Filing 9 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Katherine A. Trefz (Williams & Connolly LLP, 680 Maine Avenue SW, Washington DC 20024) for Appellant Elizabeth A. Holmes. Date of service: 12/27/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12617705] [22-10312] (Trefz, Katherine) [Entered: 12/27/2022 07:41 AM]
December 8, 2022 Filing 8 Added Attorney(s) Kevin Downey for party(s) Appellant Elizabeth A. Holmes, in case 22-10312. [12605010] (NAC) [Entered: 12/08/2022 07:02 AM]
December 8, 2022 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Kevin M. Downey (Williams & Connolly LLP, 680 Maine Avenue SW, Washington DC 20024) for Appellant Elizabeth A. Holmes. Date of service: 12/04/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12604996] [22-10312] (Downey, Kevin) [Entered: 12/08/2022 05:29 AM]
December 7, 2022 Filing 6 Added Attorney(s) John D. Cline for party(s) Appellant Elizabeth A. Holmes, in case 22-10312. [12604521] (NAC) [Entered: 12/07/2022 01:31 PM]
December 7, 2022 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of John D. Cline (Law Office of John D. Cline, 600 Stewart Street, Suite 400, Seattle, WA 98101) for Appellant Elizabeth A. Holmes. Date of service: 12/07/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12604512] [22-10312] (Cline, John) [Entered: 12/07/2022 01:27 PM]
December 6, 2022 Filing 4 Added Attorney(s) Amy Saharia for party(s) Appellant Elizabeth A. Holmes, in case 22-10312. [12603547] (NAC) [Entered: 12/06/2022 01:37 PM]
December 6, 2022 Filing 3 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Amy Mason Saharia (Williams & Connolly LLP, 680 Maine Avenue SW, Washington DC 20024) for Appellant Elizabeth A. Holmes. Date of service: 12/06/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12603525] [22-10312] (Saharia, Amy) [Entered: 12/06/2022 01:28 PM]
December 2, 2022 Filing 2 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. Reporters Transcript required: Yes. Sentence imposed: 135 Months. Transcript ordered by 12/23/2022. Transcript due 01/23/2023. Appellant briefs and excerpts due by 03/03/2023 for Elizabeth A. Holmes. Appellee brief due 04/03/2023 for United States of America. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12601394] (BY) [Entered: 12/02/2022 04:33 PM]
December 2, 2022 Filing 1 Added Attorney(s) Matthew Martin Yelovich for party(s) Appellee USA, in case 22-10312. [12601391] (BY) [Entered: 12/02/2022 04:31 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. Elizabeth Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Casey Boome
Represented By: John C. Bostic Esquire
Represented By: Amani S. Floyd
Represented By: Robert Seldon Leach
Represented By: Jeffrey Schenk
Represented By: Kelly Irene Volkar
Represented By: Matthew Martin Yelovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ELIZABETH A. HOLMES
Represented By: John D. Cline
Represented By: Kevin Downey
Represented By: Amy Saharia
Represented By: Lance Wade
Represented By: Lance A. Wade Esquire
Represented By: Katherine A. Trefz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?