Mikeal Stine v. Catricia Howard, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: MIKEAL GLENN STINE
Defendant / Appellee: CATRICIA HOWARD, named as Ms. C. Howard, Complex Warden at USP / Tucson Arizona, BASS, Unknown; named as Ms. Bass, Health Services Administrator at USP / Tucson Arizona, REY, Unknown; named as Mr. Rey, Complex Captain at USP / Tucson Arizona, STANGL, Unknown; named as Ms. Stangl, Unit Manager at USP / Tucson Arizona, TUBBS, Unknown; named as Ms. Tubbs, Associate Warden at USP - Tucson and FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Case Number: 22-15034
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2022 Filing 4 Filed original and 0 copies of Appellant Mikeal Glenn Stine opening brief of 7 pages (Informal: Yes). Served on 02/22/2022. (IFP motion pending, briefing remains stayed) [12380171] (LA) [Entered: 02/25/2022 11:58 AM]
February 22, 2022 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Mikeal Glenn Stine 2nd motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [12380246] (RR) [Entered: 02/25/2022 12:37 PM]
February 7, 2022 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Mikeal Glenn Stine motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. [12364559] (RR) [Entered: 02/08/2022 04:16 PM]
January 11, 2022 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [12337841] (CKP) [Entered: 01/11/2022 03:00 PM]
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Mikeal Glenn Stine opening brief due 03/09/2022. [12335634] (RT) [Entered: 01/10/2022 11:11 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mikeal Stine v. Catricia Howard, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIKEAL GLENN STINE
Represented By: Mikeal Glenn Stine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CATRICIA HOWARD, named as Ms. C. Howard, Complex Warden at USP / Tucson Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BASS, Unknown; named as Ms. Bass, Health Services Administrator at USP / Tucson Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REY, Unknown; named as Mr. Rey, Complex Captain at USP / Tucson Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STANGL, Unknown; named as Ms. Stangl, Unit Manager at USP / Tucson Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TUBBS, Unknown; named as Ms. Tubbs, Associate Warden at USP - Tucson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?