Mikeal Stine v. Amanda Stangl, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: MIKEAL GLENN STINE
Defendant / Appellee: AMANDA STANGL, Unit Manager at USP - Tucson, CATRICIA HOWARD, named as C. Howard, Complex Warden at USP / Tucson, GARRETT MERRELL, Lieutenant - SIS at USP / Tucson, REY, named as Mr. Rey, Captain at USP / Tucson and K. GARCIA, former Trust Fund Supervisor at USP / Tucson
Case Number: 22-15035
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2022 Filing 3 Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 2/28/2022. [12391994] (RR) [Entered: 03/10/2022 03:26 PM]
February 22, 2022 Filing 2 Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): On December 23, 2021, the district court entered an order that, among other things, dismissed appellants complaint with leave to amend and denied appellants motion for a preliminary injunction. The only portion of the December 23, 2021 order that is appealable is the portion of the order denying preliminary injunctive relief. See 28 U.S.C. 1292(a)(1); see also WMX Techs., Inc. v. Miller, 104 F.3d 1133, 1136 (9th Cir. 1997) (dismissal of complaint with leave to amend is not appealable). Therefore, the scope of this appeal is limited to a review of the portion of the district courts December 23, 2021 order denying preliminary injunctive relief. A review of the district court docket reflects that the district court granted appellant leave to proceed in forma pauperis and that such permission has not been revoked. Accordingly, appellants in forma pauperis status continues in this court. See Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(3). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1) and (2), however, appellant eventually must pay the full amount of the filing and docketing fees for this appeal. Accordingly, within 21 days of this order, appellant must complete and file with this court the enclosed authorization form, which directs the prison officials at appellants institution to assess, collect, and forward to the court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal on a monthly basis whenever funds exist in appellants trust fund account. These fees will continue to be collected regardless of the date or manner of disposition of this appeal. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), (e)(2). If appellant fails to comply with this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant complies with this order, the opening brief will be due March 31, 2022. Because there is no appearance by appellees, briefing will be complete upon the filing of the opening brief. Because appellant is proceeding without counsel, appellant is not required to file excerpts of record. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.3. The Clerk will send a prisoner authorization form to appellant along with this order. (Pro Se) [12376897] (CKP) [Entered: 02/22/2022 04:18 PM]
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: to be set. Preliminary Injunction Appeal. C.R. 3-3. [12335959] (RT) [Entered: 01/10/2022 01:36 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mikeal Stine v. Amanda Stangl, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MIKEAL GLENN STINE
Represented By: Mikeal Glenn Stine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMANDA STANGL, Unit Manager at USP - Tucson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CATRICIA HOWARD, named as C. Howard, Complex Warden at USP / Tucson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GARRETT MERRELL, Lieutenant - SIS at USP / Tucson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REY, named as Mr. Rey, Captain at USP / Tucson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: K. GARCIA, former Trust Fund Supervisor at USP / Tucson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?