Center for Biological Diversit, et al v. Deb Haaland, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE, ENDANGERED WOLF CENTER, DAVID R. PARSONS, WOLF CONSERVATION CENTER, WILDEARTH GUARDIANS, a non-profit organization and WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT, a non-profit organization
Defendant / Appellant: DEB HAALAND, as Secretary of the Department of the Interior, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, a federal department, AMY LUEDERS, in her official capacity as Southwest Regional Director of the United States Fish and Wildlife Service and UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, a federal agency
Intervenor Defendant / Appellant: NEW MEXICO DEPARTMENT OF GAME AND FISH
Case Number: 22-15056
Filed: January 13, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 Filing 10 Filed order MEDIATION (RGA): A dial-in telephone conference will be held on March 16, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time. Each participant will receive an email with dial-in information. The following cross-appeal briefing schedule shall govern these appeals: the first brief on cross-appeal for Deb Haaland, Amy Lueders, New Mexico Department of Game and Fish, United States Department of Justice and United States Fish and Wildlife Service is due May 02, 2022; the second brief on crossappeal for Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Endangered Wolf Center, David R. Parsons, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians and Wolf Conservation Center is due June 01, 2022; the third brief on cross-appeal Deb Haaland, Amy Lueders, New Mexico Department of Game and Fish, United States Department of Justice and United States Fish and Wildlife Service.is due July 01, 2022; Optional cross appeal Reply brief for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Endangered Wolf Center, David R. Parsons and Wolf Conservation Center is due within 21 days of service. [12372749] [22-15029, 22-15056, 22-15091] (WL) [Entered: 02/16/2022 04:45 PM]
January 28, 2022 Filing 9 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/28/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12354507]. [22-15056] (AD) [Entered: 01/28/2022 12:44 PM]
January 28, 2022 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) Appellants Center for Biological Diversity, DOW, Endangered Wolf Center, David R. Parsons and Wolf Conservation Center in 22-15091, Appellees Center for Biological Diversity, DOW, Endangered Wolf Center, David R. Parsons and Wolf Conservation Center in 22-15056 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/28/2022. [12354257] [22-15091, 22-15029, 22-15056] (Forsyth, Elizabeth) [Entered: 01/28/2022 10:41 AM]
January 27, 2022 Filing 7 Filed order MEDIATION (RGA): These appeals are consolidated. [12353194] [22-15029, 22-15056, 22-15091] (WL) [Entered: 01/27/2022 11:09 AM]
January 27, 2022 Filing 6 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 02/16/2022, 1:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. See order for instructions and details. [12353002] [22-15029, 22-15056, 22-15091] (VS) [Entered: 01/27/2022 09:37 AM]
January 21, 2022 Filing 5 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: By 01/28/2022, counsel to email Circuit Mediator regarding settlement potential. Include Ninth Circuit case name and number in subject line. This communication will be kept confidential, if requested, and should not be filed with the court. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. [12346936] (VS) [Entered: 01/21/2022 09:46 AM]
January 21, 2022 Filing 4 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Appellants Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Endangered Wolf Center, David R. Parsons and Wolf Conservation Center Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/28/2022. First cross appeal brief due 03/15/2022 for Deb Haaland, Amy Lueders, New Mexico Department of Game and Fish, United States Department of Justice and United States Fish and Wildlife Service. Second brief on cross appeal due 04/15/2022 for Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Endangered Wolf Center, David R. Parsons, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians and Wolf Conservation Center. Third brief on cross appeal due 05/16/2022 for Deb Haaland, Amy Lueders, New Mexico Department of Game and Fish, United States Department of Justice and United States Fish and Wildlife Service. Optional cross appeal Reply brief for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Endangered Wolf Center, David R. Parsons and Wolf Conservation Center is due within 21 days of service of Third brief on cross appeal. [12346860] [22-15091, 22-15056] (RT) [Entered: 01/21/2022 09:18 AM]
January 20, 2022 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/20/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12346041]. [22-15056] (AD) [Entered: 01/20/2022 12:44 PM]
January 20, 2022 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Deb Haaland, Amy Lueders, USDOJ and USFWS Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/20/2022. [12345820] [22-15056] (Maysonett, James) [Entered: 01/20/2022 11:23 AM]
January 13, 2022 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Deb Haaland, Amy Lueders, United States Department of Justice and United States Fish and Wildlife Service Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/20/2022. Appellants Deb Haaland, Amy Lueders, United States Department of Justice and United States Fish and Wildlife Service opening brief due 03/15/2022. Appellees Center for Biological Diversity, Defenders of Wildlife, Endangered Wolf Center, David R. Parsons, Western Watersheds Project, WildEarth Guardians and Wolf Conservation Center answering brief due 04/15/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12339958] (RT) [Entered: 01/13/2022 11:11 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversit, et al v. Deb Haaland, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Represented By: Elizabeth Britta Forsyth
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Preso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE
Represented By: Elizabeth Britta Forsyth
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Preso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ENDANGERED WOLF CENTER
Represented By: Elizabeth Britta Forsyth
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Preso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DAVID R. PARSONS
Represented By: Elizabeth Britta Forsyth
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Preso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WOLF CONSERVATION CENTER
Represented By: Elizabeth Britta Forsyth
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Preso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILDEARTH GUARDIANS, a non-profit organization
Represented By: Matthew Kellogg Bishop
Represented By: Kelly E. Nokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WESTERN WATERSHEDS PROJECT, a non-profit organization
Represented By: Matthew Kellogg Bishop
Represented By: Kelly E. Nokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DEB HAALAND, as Secretary of the Department of the Interior
Represented By: James Maysonett
Represented By: Anthony Dolendo Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, a federal department
Represented By: James Maysonett
Represented By: Anthony Dolendo Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: AMY LUEDERS, in her official capacity as Southwest Regional Director of the United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: James Maysonett
Represented By: Anthony Dolendo Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, a federal agency
Represented By: James Maysonett
Represented By: Anthony Dolendo Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellant: NEW MEXICO DEPARTMENT OF GAME AND FISH
Represented By: Paul S. Weiland Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?