Tanya Winters v. Industrial Commission of Arizona, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: TANYA WINTERS
Defendant / Appellee: INDUSTRIAL COMMISSION OF ARIZONA and MARK BRNOVICH, Attorney General
Case Number: 22-16621
Filed: October 20, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2022 Filing 10 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: MF): A review of the docket reflects that appellant has filed several motions and notices, but has failed to respond to the courts November 1, 2022 order to show cause. The court sua sponte grants appellant an extension of time to respond to the order to show cause. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant must file a response to the November 1, 2022 order to show cause. If appellant fails to comply with this order, the appeal will be dismissed by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. Briefing is stayed pending further order of the court. All pending motions will be addressed after appellant complies with the November 1, 2022 order to show cause. The Clerk will send a copy of the November 1, 2022 order to appellant along with this order. [12604600] (CKP) [Entered: 12/07/2022 02:04 PM]
December 5, 2022 Filing 9 Received notice of change of address dated 11/28/2022 from Tanya Winters. New address: 1000 N. Beeline, #252, Payson, AZ 85541. [12602805]--[Edited: address updated. 12/06/2022 by SLM] (HH) [Entered: 12/05/2022 04:59 PM]
December 5, 2022 Filing 8 Filed Appellant Tanya Winters notice of filings. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12602802] (HH) [Entered: 12/05/2022 04:57 PM]
December 5, 2022 Filing 7 Filed Appellant Tanya Winters motion petitioning for a writ of mandamus. Deficiencies: None. [12602798] (HH) [Entered: 12/05/2022 04:55 PM]
December 5, 2022 Filing 6 Filed Appellant Tanya Winters motion seeking transparency. Deficiencies: None. Served on 11/18/2022. [12602790] (HH) [Entered: 12/05/2022 04:53 PM]
November 7, 2022 Filing 5 Filed Appellant Tanya Winters' Exhibits. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12581325] (HH) [Entered: 11/07/2022 10:22 AM]
November 1, 2022 Filing 4 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: JW): A review of the district courts docket reflects that the district court has certified that this appeal is not taken in good faith and has revoked appellants in forma pauperis status. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). This court may dismiss a case at any time, if the court determines the case is frivolous. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). Within 35 days after the date of this order, appellant must: (1) file a motion to dismiss this appeal, see Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or (2) file a statement explaining why the appeal is not frivolous and should go forward. If appellant files a statement that the appeal should go forward, appellant also must: (1) file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, OR (2) pay to the district court $505.00 for the filing and docketing fees for this appeal AND file in this court proof that the $505.00 was paid. If appellant does not respond to this order, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute, without further notice. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. If appellant files a motion to dismiss the appeal, the Clerk will dismiss this appeal, pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). If appellant submits any response to this order other than a motion to dismiss the appeal, the court may dismiss this appeal as frivolous, without further notice. The briefing schedule for this appeal is stayed. The Clerk shall serve on appellant: (1) a form motion to voluntarily dismiss the appeal, (2) a form statement that the appeal should go forward, and (3) a Form 4 financial affidavit. Appellant may use the enclosed forms for any motion to dismiss the appeal, statement that the appeal should go forward, and/or motion to proceed in forma pauperis. [12578176] (CKP) [Entered: 11/01/2022 02:59 PM]
October 27, 2022 Filing 3 Received copy of District Court order filed on 10/22/1022: Certifies appeal not taken in good faith. [12574208] (HH) [Entered: 10/27/2022 10:42 AM]
October 24, 2022 Filing 2 Filed referral notice (Deputy Clerk:CKP): Referring to the district court for determination whether in forma pauperis status should continue for this appeal. [12570831] (CKP) [Entered: 10/23/2022 03:35 PM]
October 20, 2022 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Tanya Winters opening brief due 12/12/2022. [12569490] (WL) [Entered: 10/20/2022 04:29 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Tanya Winters v. Industrial Commission of Arizona, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TANYA WINTERS
Represented By: Tanya Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INDUSTRIAL COMMISSION OF ARIZONA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK BRNOVICH, Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?