Thomas Lallande, IV v. Maricopa County Board of Supervisors, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: THOMAS J. LALLANDE IV
Defendant / Appellee: MARICOPA COUNTY BOARD OF SUPERVISORS, UNKNOWN PARTY, named as Maricopa County Correctional Health Services Director, MCCHS, PAUL PENZONE, Sheriff, UNKNOWN PARTY, named as Maricopa County Public Health Services Director, MCPHS, UNKNOWN PARTY, named as Arizona Department of Health Services Director, ADHS, BILL WILLIAMS, External Referee, LAREDO, Unknown ; Sgt., BRAND, Unknown ; Sgt. Badge #1664, PRICE, Unknown: Lt. Badge #A8356 and ALLEN, Unknown; Lt. Badge #A7416
Case Number: 22-16777
Filed: November 17, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 5, 2023 THOMAS LALLANDE, IV V. MARICOPA COUNTY BOARD OF SUPERVISORS, ET AL

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2023 Filing 12 Filed Appellant Thomas J. Lallande, IV FORM 33 Inmate declaration of timely filing. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12622666] (QDL) [Entered: 01/04/2023 11:39 AM]
December 27, 2022 Filing 11 Filed original and 0 copies of Appellant Thomas J. Lallande, IV opening brief of 9 pages (Informal: Yes). Served on 12/19/2022. [12618398] (KT) [Entered: 12/27/2022 02:20 PM]
December 27, 2022 Filing 10 Filed (ECF) Appellees Maricopa County Board of Supervisors and Sheriff Paul Penzone Correspondence: Letter advising the Court that the defendants will not be filing an answering brief unless the court specifically orders it.. Date of service: 12/27/2022 [12618280] [22-16777] (Gottfried, Michael) [Entered: 12/27/2022 12:57 PM]
December 27, 2022 Filing 9 Added Attorney(s) Michael E. Gottfried for party(s) Appellee Maricopa County Board of Supervisors and Appellee Paul Penzone, in case 22-16777. [12618080] (QDL) [Entered: 12/27/2022 12:01 PM]
December 27, 2022 Filing 8 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Michael E. Gottfried (Maricopa County Attorney 225 W. Madison Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003) for Appellees Maricopa County Board of Supervisors and Sheriff Paul Penzone. Date of service: 12/27/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12618039] [22-16777] (Gottfried, Michael) [Entered: 12/27/2022 11:35 AM]
December 5, 2022 Filing 7 Filed Appellant Thomas J. Lallande, IV letter dated 11/23/2022 re: Request for copy of docket sheet. Paper filing deficiency: None. (Sent appellant copy of docket sheet.) [12603186] (QDL) [Entered: 12/06/2022 10:23 AM]
December 5, 2022 Filing 6 Received PLRA authorization response from appellant. Dated 11/23/2022. [Case Number 22-16777: Partially Paid] [12603181] (QDL) [Entered: 12/06/2022 10:21 AM]
November 18, 2022 Filing 5 Filed order MEDIATION (BS): The court's order of November 18, 2022 (Docket Entry No. [ # 4 ]) is vacated as having been entered in error. [12591625] (JMR) [Entered: 11/18/2022 03:10 PM]
November 18, 2022 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: The Mediation Program of the Ninth Cir. Court of Appeals facilitates settlement while appeals are pending. See FRAP 33 & Ninth Cir.R. 33-1. Mediation assessment conferences are not routinely scheduled in social security appeals. Csl are encouraged to contact circuit mediator if they believe this social security appeal has remand potential or is otherwise amenable to resolution. Specifically, csl are requested to contact the mediator if claimant has been awarded benefits after the district court's decision or if claimant is deceased. The mediator can also assist csl with procedural matters that may lead to the resolution of an appeal. Csl for the party contacting the Mediation Program are encouraged to copy csl for the other party to the appeal on any such requests. Info regarding the mediation program may be found at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. [12591254] (BLS) [Entered: 11/18/2022 12:23 PM]
November 17, 2022 Filing 3 CLERK ORDER FILED (Deputy Clerk CKP) Prisoner fee authorization form sent to prisoner. [12590408] (CKP) [Entered: 11/17/2022 02:57 PM]
November 17, 2022 Filing 2 Fee status changed ( [Case Number 22-16777: IFP] ). [12590403] (CKP) [Entered: 11/17/2022 02:56 PM]
November 17, 2022 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Thomas J. Lallande IV opening brief due 01/13/2023. Appellees Allen, Brand, Laredo, Maricopa County Board of Supervisors, Paul Penzone, Price, Unknown Party and Bill Williams answering brief due 02/13/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12589769] (ABT) [Entered: 11/17/2022 10:41 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Thomas Lallande, IV v. Maricopa County Board of Supervisors, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THOMAS J. LALLANDE IV
Represented By: Thomas J. Lallande IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARICOPA COUNTY BOARD OF SUPERVISORS
Represented By: Sherle Flaggman Esquire
Represented By: Angela D. Lane
Represented By: Maxine S. Mak Esquire
Represented By: Michael E. Gottfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN PARTY, named as Maricopa County Correctional Health Services Director, MCCHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL PENZONE, Sheriff
Represented By: Michael E. Gottfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN PARTY, named as Maricopa County Public Health Services Director, MCPHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN PARTY, named as Arizona Department of Health Services Director, ADHS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BILL WILLIAMS, External Referee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAREDO, Unknown ; Sgt.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRAND, Unknown ; Sgt. Badge #1664
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PRICE, Unknown: Lt. Badge #A8356
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALLEN, Unknown; Lt. Badge #A7416
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?