Michael Greenstein, et al v. Noblr Reciprocal Exchange
Plaintiff / Appellant: MICHAEL GREENSTEIN, CYNTHIA NELSON and SINKWAN AU, individually and on behalf of themselves and all other persons similarly situated
Defendant / Appellee: NOBLR RECIPROCAL EXCHANGE, a Colorado corporation
Case Number: 22-17023
Filed: December 30, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2023 Filing 9 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12646805] (VS) [Entered: 02/06/2023 10:55 AM]
February 1, 2023 Filing 8 Added Attorney Jeremy Keith Robinson for Appellants Michael Greenstein, Sinkwan Au and Cynthia Nelson, in case 22-17023. [12644112] (HH) [Entered: 02/01/2023 02:04 PM]
February 1, 2023 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jeremy K. Robinson (Caesy Gerry Schenk Francavilla Blatt & Penfield, LLP, 110 Laurel Street, San Diego, CA 92101) for Appellants Sinkwan Au, Michael Greenstein and Cynthia Nelson. Date of service: 02/01/2023. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12644010] [22-17023] (Robinson, Jeremy) [Entered: 02/01/2023 01:03 PM]
January 26, 2023 Filing 6 Added Attorney Francis Xavier Nolan IV for Appellee Noblr Reciprocal Exchange, in case 22-17023. [12639756] (HH) [Entered: 01/26/2023 02:06 PM]
January 26, 2023 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Francis X. Nolan, IV (Eversheds Sutherland (US) LLP, The Grace Building, 1114 Avenue of the Americas, 40th Floor, New York, New York 10036) for Appellee Noblr Reciprocal Exchange. Date of service: 01/26/2023. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12639614] [22-17023] (Nolan, Francis) [Entered: 01/26/2023 01:13 PM]
January 26, 2023 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN AssessmentConference, 02/06/2023, 09:00 a.m., PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12639574] (VS) [Entered: 01/26/2023 12:43 PM]
January 6, 2023 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 01/06/2023. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12625260]. [22-17023] (AD) [Entered: 01/06/2023 06:44 PM]
January 6, 2023 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Sinkwan Au, Michael Greenstein and Cynthia Nelson Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/06/2023. [12625005] [22-17023] (Blatt, Gayle) [Entered: 01/06/2023 03:10 PM]
December 30, 2022 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Sinkwan Au, Michael Greenstein and Cynthia Nelson Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/06/2023. Appellants Sinkwan Au, Michael Greenstein and Cynthia Nelson opening brief due 03/02/2023. Appellee Noblr Reciprocal Exchange answering brief due 04/03/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12620351] (RT) [Entered: 12/30/2022 09:53 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Michael Greenstein, et al v. Noblr Reciprocal Exchange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL GREENSTEIN
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: David S. Casey II
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CYNTHIA NELSON
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: David S. Casey II
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SINKWAN AU, individually and on behalf of themselves and all other persons similarly situated
Represented By: Gayle M. Blatt
Represented By: David S. Casey II
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NOBLR RECIPROCAL EXCHANGE, a Colorado corporation
Represented By: Ian Shelton
Represented By: Francis Xavier Nolan IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?