Terrance Irby v. Clifford Johnson, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: TERRANCE JON IRBY
Defendant / Appellee: CLIFFORD JOHNSON, Doctor, Clallam Bay Corrections Center, STEPHEN SINCLAIR, Former Secretary, Department of Corrections, CHERYL STRANGE, Secretary, Department of Corrections, AMY MOK, Doctor and MOORE, Provider, Washington State Corrections Center
Case Number: 22-35033
Filed: January 12, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2022 Filing 4 Filed original and 0 copies of Appellant Terrance Jon Irby opening brief of 14 pages (Informal: Yes). Served on 03/01/2022. [12391522] (LA) [Entered: 03/10/2022 11:35 AM]
February 25, 2022 Filing 3 Filed order (MARSHA S. BERZON and MARK J. BENNETT) Appellants motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]) is granted. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1) and (2), however, appellant eventually must pay the full amount of the filing and docketing fees for this appeal. Accordingly, within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall complete and file with this court the enclosed prisoner authorization form, which directs the prison officials at appellants institution to assess, collect, and forward to the court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal on a monthly basis whenever funds exist in appellants trust fund account. These fees will continue to be collected regardless of the date or manner of disposition of this appeal. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), (e)(2). If appellant fails to comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. The opening brief is due April 8, 2022. Because there is no appearance by appellees, briefing will be completed upon the filing of the opening brief. Because appellant is proceeding without counsel, appellant is not required to file excerpts of record. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.3. The Clerk shall serve this order and a prisoner authorization form on appellant. [12380717] (WL) [Entered: 02/25/2022 03:48 PM]
January 12, 2022 Filing 2 Filed Appellant Terrance Jon Irby motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 12/31/2021. [12338705] (RT) [Entered: 01/12/2022 11:41 AM]
January 12, 2022 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Terrance Jon Irby opening brief due 03/14/2022. [12338692] (RT) [Entered: 01/12/2022 11:36 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Terrance Irby v. Clifford Johnson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TERRANCE JON IRBY
Represented By: Terrance Jon Irby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CLIFFORD JOHNSON, Doctor, Clallam Bay Corrections Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN SINCLAIR, Former Secretary, Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHERYL STRANGE, Secretary, Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMY MOK, Doctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MOORE, Provider, Washington State Corrections Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?