Friends of the Clearwater, et al v. Carl Petrick, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: FRIENDS OF THE CLEARWATER and ALLIANCE FOR THE WILD ROCKIES
Defendant / Appellee: CARL PETRICK, n his official capacity as Forest Supervisor of the Idaho Panhandle National Forests, UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE, an agency of the U.S. Department of Agriculture and UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, an agency of the U.S. Department of Interior
Intervenor Defendant / Appellee: STIMSON LUMBER COMPANY
Case Number: 22-35421
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2022 Filing 5 MEDIATION STATUS REPORT DUE - 08/03/2022. See order for details. [12478399] [22-35381, 22-35421, 22-35382] (VS) [Entered: 06/23/2022 01:08 PM]
June 8, 2022 Filing 4 MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 06/23/2022, 12:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12466523] [22-35381, 22-35382, 22-35421] (BLS) [Entered: 06/08/2022 01:16 PM]
June 2, 2022 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 06/02/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12462545]. [22-35421] (AD) [Entered: 06/02/2022 06:44 PM]
June 2, 2022 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellants Alliance for the Wild Rockies and Friends of the Clearwater in 22-35421, Appellees Alliance for the Wild Rockies and Friends of the Clearwater in 22-35381, 22-35382 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 06/02/2022. [12462101] [22-35421, 22-35381, 22-35382] (Smith, Rebecca) [Entered: 06/02/2022 12:51 PM]
May 31, 2022 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Appellants Alliance for the Wild Rockies and Friends of the Clearwater Mediation Questionnaire due on 06/07/2022. First cross appeal brief due 08/24/2022 for Carl Petrick, Stimson Lumber Company, United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Alliance for the Wild Rockies and Friends of the Clearwater. Second brief on cross appeal due 09/26/2022 for Alliance for the Wild Rockies and Friends of the Clearwater. Third brief on cross appeal due 10/26/2022 for Carl Petrick, Stimson Lumber Company, United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Forest Service, Alliance for the Wild Rockies and Friends of the Clearwater. Optional cross appeal Reply brief for Alliance for the Wild Rockies and Friends of the Clearwater is due within 21 days after service of Third brief on cross appeal. [12460140] [22-35421, 22-35381, 22-35382] (RT) [Entered: 05/31/2022 03:31 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Friends of the Clearwater, et al v. Carl Petrick, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRIENDS OF THE CLEARWATER
Represented By: Rebecca Kay Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ALLIANCE FOR THE WILD ROCKIES
Represented By: Rebecca Kay Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARL PETRICK, n his official capacity as Forest Supervisor of the Idaho Panhandle National Forests
Represented By: Rachel E. Heron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE, an agency of the U.S. Department of Agriculture
Represented By: Rachel E. Heron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, an agency of the U.S. Department of Interior
Represented By: Rachel E. Heron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant / appellee: STIMSON LUMBER COMPANY
Represented By: Sara Ghafouri
Represented By: Julie A. Weis Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?