Charles Farnsworth v. Jeri Boe
Petitioner / Appellant: CHARLES VERDEL FARNSWORTH
Respondent / Appellee: JERI BOE, Clallam Bay Superintendent
Case Number: 22-35805
Filed: October 13, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 13, 2024 CHARLES FARNSWORTH V. JERI BOE

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 Filing 6 Filed Appellant Charles Verdel Farnsworth letter dated 11/16/2022 re: questions re: d/c court record & pending motions. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12593435] (DJV) [Entered: 11/22/2022 06:17 AM]
November 8, 2022 Filing 5 Sent Petitioner/ Appellant a copy of the FRAP and Ninth Circuit rules in response to the Form 29 request filed on 11-07-2022. [12582426] (JR) [Entered: 11/08/2022 09:34 AM]
November 7, 2022 Filing 4 Filed Appellant Charles Verdel Farnsworth letter dated 11/01/2022 re: request for court rules. Paper filing deficiency: None. [12582309] (DJV) [Entered: 11/08/2022 07:04 AM]
November 7, 2022 Filing 3 Filed Appellant Charles Verdel Farnsworth motion for appointment of counsel. Deficiencies: None. Served on 11/01/2022. [12582306] (DJV) [Entered: 11/08/2022 07:02 AM]
November 7, 2022 Filing 2 Filed Appellant Charles Verdel Farnsworth motion for an eot to file aob. Deficiencies: None. Served on 11/01/2022. [12582305] (DJV) [Entered: 11/08/2022 07:00 AM]
October 13, 2022 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Charles Verdel Farnsworth opening brief due 12/12/2022. Appellee Jeri Boe answering brief due 01/10/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12562780] (WL) [Entered: 10/13/2022 02:43 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Charles Farnsworth v. Jeri Boe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: CHARLES VERDEL FARNSWORTH
Represented By: Charles Verdel Farnsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: JERI BOE, Clallam Bay Superintendent
Represented By: John Joseph Samson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?