William Witter v. William Reubart, et al
Petitioner / Appellant: WILLIAM WITTER
Respondent / Appellee: WILLIAM REUBART, Warden and AARON FORD, Attorney General for the State of Nevada
Case Number: 22-99003
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: Death Penalty
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Filing 5 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: KMB): On May 10, 2022, the district court denied appellants Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 59(e) motion. The stay of proceedings in this court (Docket Entry No. [ # 2 ]) is therefore lifted and this appeal will move forward. This court will rule on the request for a certificate of appealability and any pending motions in a later order. To challenge the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motion, appellant must file an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). [12461139] (WL) [Entered: 06/01/2022 01:49 PM]
May 31, 2022 Filing 4 Filed (ECF) Appellant William Witter Correspondence: Notice to the Court re: DktEntry 2. Date of service: 05/31/2022 [12459966] [22-99003] (Newman, Stacy) [Entered: 05/31/2022 02:21 PM]
May 10, 2022 Filing 3 Received copy of District Court order filed on 05/10/2022 certificate of appealability denied. [12442994] (DJV) [Entered: 05/10/2022 01:37 PM]
April 12, 2022 Filing 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: KMB): This appeal was filed while a timely Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4) motion was pending in the district court. The notice of appeal is therefore ineffective, see Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4), and proceedings in this court will be stayed until the district court decides the April 7, 2022 motion. See Leader Natl Ins. Co. v. Industrial Indemnity Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444 (9th Cir. 1994). Within 21 days after the district courts decision, appellant must notify this court in writing of the decision and state whether he wishes to move forward with this appeal. To challenge the decision on the post-judgment motion, appellant must file an amended notice of appeal within the time set by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). A copy of this order will be sent to the district court. [12418861] (AF) [Entered: 04/12/2022 02:19 PM]
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. [12417000] (BY) [Entered: 04/11/2022 10:12 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: William Witter v. William Reubart, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: WILLIAM WITTER
Represented By: David Anthony Esquire
Represented By: Stacy M. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: WILLIAM REUBART, Warden
Represented By: Jeffrey Morgan Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: AARON FORD, Attorney General for the State of Nevada
Represented By: Jeffrey Morgan Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?