United States of America v. Goodwin
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant / Appellant: JAMES C GOODWIN, III
Case Number: 23-1518
Filed: July 20, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 5, 2024 USA V. GOODWIN

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE to motion to extend time to file answering brief (DE 10) filed by Appellant James C Goodwin, III. [Entered: 11/14/2023 03:49 PM]
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FILED. Appellee's motion (Docket Entry No. 10) for an extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. The court is not inclined to grant further extensions of time to file the answering brief. See July 11, 2023, Announcement at https://www.ca9.uscourts.gov. Any further motion must show extraordinary and compelling circumstances. The answering brief is due February 15, 2024. The optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [Entered: 11/13/2023 04:11 PM]
October 30, 2023 Filing 11 DEFECTIVE -- SUPPLEMENT to Motion Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief (DE 10) filed by Appellee United States of America. [Duplicate filing, correct entry is DE 10.] [Entered: 10/30/2023 11:05 AM] [Edited: 10/30/2023 11:52 AM]
October 30, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Extend Time to File Answering Brief filed by Appellee United States of America. [COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected PDF.] [Entered: 10/30/2023 10:20 AM] [Edited: 10/30/2023 11:09 AM]
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FILED. Appellants response (Docket Entry No. 8) to this courts July 21, 2023, order includes a completed financial affidavit, which is treated as a motion to proceed in forma pauperis and is granted. The Clerk will amend the docket to reflect that appellant is proceeding in forma pauperis. Appellants response also refers to his submission at Docket Entry No. 5 as his opening brief, and the court has filed it as such. Appellees answering brief remains due November 15, 2023, and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. [Entered: 08/22/2023 09:38 AM]
August 10, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Court order (DE 7) filed by Appellant James C Goodwin, III. Locked PDF (contains CJA 23 form). [Entered: 08/15/2023 08:42 AM] [Edited: 08/16/2023 12:04 PM]
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FILED. The filing and docketing fees for this appeal are overdue. Within 21 days after this order, appellant must pay to the district court the $505.00 filing and docketing fees for this appeal, and file in this court proof of such payment. Alternatively, appellant may file in this court a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, which must be accompanied by a current financial affidavit (CJA Form 23). Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of this appeal by the Clerk for failure to prosecute. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. The court has received appellants submission titled APPEAL OF THE DISTRICT COURTS DENIAL OF MOTIONS, which appellant signed on July 11, 2023. Within 21 days of this order, appellant must notify this court in writing as to whether appellant intends for this submission to serve as his opening brief. The Clerk will serve a CJA Form 23 on appellant. [Entered: 07/21/2023 03:21 PM]
July 20, 2023 Filing 6 CLERK ACTION: Opening Brief submitted at DE 5 by Appellant James C Goodwin, III is filed with minor deficiency. Original and 0 copies. Deficiency: Fee Due. [Entered: 07/20/2023 02:35 PM] [Edited: 07/20/2023 02:55 PM]
July 20, 2023 Filing 5 OPENING BRIEF submitted for filing by Appellant James C Goodwin, III. [Entered: 07/20/2023 02:32 PM]
July 20, 2023 Filing 4 TERMINATED participation of Counsel for Appellee Kevin Thomas Maloney representing Appellee United States of America. [Entered: 07/20/2023 02:30 PM]
July 20, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of withdrawal as counsel filed by Kevin Thomas Maloney. [Entered: 07/20/2023 12:58 PM]
July 20, 2023 Filing 2 SCHEDULE NOTICE. Sentence imposed: N/A. Criminal Appeal Transcript Order Due 8/7/2023, Criminal Appeal Transcript Due 9/6/2023, Criminal Appeal Opening Brief Due 10/16/2023, Criminal Appeal Answering Brief Due 11/15/2023. All briefs shall be served and filed pursuant to FRAP 31 and 9th Cir. R. 31-2.1. Failure of the petitioner to comply with this briefing schedule may result in automatic dismissal of the appeal. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1 [Entered: 07/20/2023 10:43 AM]
July 20, 2023 Filing 1 CASE OPENED. A copy of your notice of appeal / petition filed in 4:18-cr-00072-DCN-1 has been received in the Clerk's office of the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. The U.S. Court of Appeals docket number 23-1518 has been assigned to this case. All communications with the court must indicate this Court of Appeals docket number. Please carefully review the docket to ensure the name(s) and contact information are correct. It is your responsibility to alert the court if your contact information changes. Resources Available For more information about case processing and to assist you in preparing your brief, please review the Case Opening Information (for #attorneys and #pro se litigants) and review the #Appellate Practice Guide. Counsel should consider contacting the court's #Appellate Mentoring Program for help with the brief and argument. [Entered: 07/20/2023 10:40 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: United States of America v. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Mr. John Christopher Shirts
Represented By: Mr. Kevin Thomas Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JAMES C GOODWIN, III
Represented By: James C Goodwin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?