Cedar Park Assembly of God of Kirkland, Washington v. Myron Kreidler, et al
Plaintiff / Appellee: CEDAR PARK ASSEMBLY OF GOD OF KIRKLAND, WASHINGTON
Defendant / Appellant: MYRON KREIDLER, in his official capacity as Insurance Commissioner for the State of Washington, AKA Mike Kreidler and JAY ROBERT INSLEE, in his official capacity as Governor of the State of Washington
Case Number: 23-35585
Filed: September 7, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2023 Filing 8 Added Attorney(s) Tera Marie Heintz for party(s) Appellee Jay Robert Inslee Appellee Myron Kreidler. [12795178] [23-35560, 23-35585] (RL) [Entered: 09/19/2023 03:21 PM]
September 19, 2023 Filing 7 Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Tera M. Heintz (Washington Attorney General's Office 1125 Washington St SE Olympia, WA 98504) for Appellees Jay Robert Inslee and Myron Kreidler in 23-35560, Appellants Jay Robert Inslee and Myron Kreidler in 23-35585. Date of service: 09/19/2023. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12795160] [23-35560, 23-35585] (Heintz, Tera) [Entered: 09/19/2023 03:04 PM]
September 18, 2023 Filing 6 Streamlined request [5] by Appellant Cedar Park Assembly of God of Kirkland, Washington in 23-35560, Appellee Cedar Park Assembly of God of Kirkland, Washington in 23-35585 to extend time to file the brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: First cross appeal brief due 11/22/2023 for Cedar Park Assembly of God of Kirkland, Washington. Second brief on cross appeal due 12/22/2023 for Jay Robert Inslee and Myron Kreidler. Third brief on cross appeal due 01/22/2024 for Cedar Park Assembly of God of Kirkland, Washington. The optional reply brief is due 21 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [12794319] [23-35560, 23-35585] (DR) [Entered: 09/18/2023 03:39 PM]
September 18, 2023 Filing 5 Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Opening Brief by Appellant Cedar Park Assembly of God of Kirkland, Washington in 23-35560, Appellee Cedar Park Assembly of God of Kirkland, Washington in 23-35585. New requested due date is 11/22/2023. [12794030] [23-35560, 23-35585] (Gray, Rory) [Entered: 09/18/2023 12:52 PM]
September 13, 2023 Filing 4 MEDIATION ORDER FILED: This case is RELEASED from the Mediation Program. [12791711] [23-35560, 23-35585] (BLS) [Entered: 09/13/2023 02:25 PM]
September 12, 2023 Filing 3 The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 09/12/2023. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12791165]. [23-35585] (AD) [Entered: 09/12/2023 06:44 PM]
September 12, 2023 Filing 2 Filed (ECF) Appellees Jay Robert Inslee and Myron Kreidler in 23-35560, Appellants Jay Robert Inslee and Myron Kreidler in 23-35585 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/12/2023. [12791137] [23-35560, 23-35585] (Smith, Karl) [Entered: 09/12/2023 05:46 PM]
September 7, 2023 Filing 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Appellants Jay Robert Inslee and Myron Kreidler Mediation Questionnaire due on 09/14/2023. First cross appeal brief due 10/23/2023 for Cedar Park Assembly of God of Kirkland, Washington. Second brief on cross appeal due 11/22/2023 for Jay Robert Inslee and Myron Kreidler. Third brief on cross appeal due 12/22/2023 for Cedar Park Assembly of God of Kirkland, Washington. Optional cross appeal Reply brief for Jay Robert Inslee and Myron Kreidler due within 21 days of service of Third brief on cross appeal. [12788131] [23-35585, 23-35560] (RT) [Entered: 09/07/2023 11:04 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Cedar Park Assembly of God of Kirkland, Washington v. Myron Kreidler, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CEDAR PARK ASSEMBLY OF GOD OF KIRKLAND, WASHINGTON
Represented By: John J. Bursch
Represented By: David Andrew Cortman
Represented By: Rory Thomas Gray
Represented By: Kevin Theriot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MYRON KREIDLER, in his official capacity as Insurance Commissioner for the State of Washington, AKA Mike Kreidler
Represented By: Marta DeLeon
Represented By: Karl D. Smith
Represented By: Tera Marie Heintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JAY ROBERT INSLEE, in his official capacity as Governor of the State of Washington
Represented By: Marta DeLeon
Represented By: Karl D. Smith
Represented By: Tera Marie Heintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?