Rodriguez v. Albonico, et al.
Plaintiff: DAVID ARNOLD RODRIGUEZ
Defendant: D. COX, CRADDOCK, N. ALBONICO, KYLE LOFTIN and J. JACKSON
Case Number: 24-7528
Filed: December 13, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2025 Filing 6 District Court Order/Notice Received. MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Daniel J. Calabretta on 1/22/2025: The Court is advised that proceedings in the Ninth Circuit case, 24-7528, are stayed until the district court rules on Plaintiff's 158 Motion to Reopen Case/Trial. Accordingly, Defendants shall file an opposition to Plaintiff's motion within twenty-one (21) days. Plaintiff shall file a reply, if any, within fourteen (14) days thereafter. IT IS SO ORDERED. [TEXT ENTRY ONLY.] [Entered: 01/24/2025 12:39 PM]
January 17, 2025 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Proceedings in this Court filed by Appellant David Arnold Rodriguez. [Entered: 01/17/2025 03:37 PM]
January 17, 2025 Filing 4 CORRESPONDENCE filed by Appellant David Arnold Rodriguez. [Entered: 01/17/2025 03:36 PM]
January 16, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FILED. Proceedings in this court are stayed until the district court rules on the timely tolling motion filed on December 6, 2024. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4); Leader Natl Ins. Co. v. Indus. Indem. Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444, 445 (9th Cir. 1994). To challenge the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motion, appellant must file a timely notice of appeal. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a). The clerk will send a copy of this order to the district judge. [Entered: 01/16/2025 12:52 PM]
December 13, 2024 Filing 2 SCHEDULE NOTICE. Appeal Transcript Order Due (Appellant) 12/20/2024, Appeal Transcript Due (Appellant) 1/20/2025, Appeal Opening Brief Due (Appellant) 2/28/2025, Appeal Answering Brief Due (Appellee) 3/31/2025. For appeal no. 24-7528, 2:19-cv-01108-DJC-AC. All briefs shall be served and filed pursuant to FRAP 31 and 9th Cir. R. 31-2.1. Failure of the petitioner(s)/appellant(s) to comply with this briefing schedule will result in automatic dismissal of the appeal. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [Entered: 12/13/2024 09:56 AM]
December 13, 2024 Filing 1 CASE OPENED. A copy of your notice of appeal / petition filed in 2:19-cv-01108-DJC-AC has been received in the Clerk's office of the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. The U.S. Court of Appeals docket number 24-7528 has been assigned to this case. All communications with the court must indicate this Court of Appeals docket number. Please carefully review the docket to ensure the name(s) and contact information are correct. It is your responsibility to alert the court if your contact information changes. Resources Available For more information about case processing and to assist you in preparing your brief, please review the Case Opening Information (for #attorneys and #pro se litigants) and review the #Appellate Practice Guide. Attorneys should consider contacting the court's #Appellate Mentoring Program for help with the brief and argument. [Entered: 12/13/2024 09:52 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Albonico, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. COX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRADDOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. ALBONICO
Represented By: David Edward Kuchinsky
Represented By: Brian Shu-Yen Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYLE LOFTIN
Represented By: David Edward Kuchinsky
Represented By: Brian Shu-Yen Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. JACKSON
Represented By: David Edward Kuchinsky
Represented By: Brian Shu-Yen Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID ARNOLD RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: David Arnold Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?