Johnson v. Thornell, et al.
Plaintiff: VINSON TREMAYNE JOHNSON
Defendant: RYAN THORNELL, DIRECTOR OF THE ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, REHABILITATION, DAVID SHINN, DIRECTOR, ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, REHABILITATION, AND REENTRY, S. BRENNAN and T. KOPP
Case Number: 25-393
Filed: January 21, 2025
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FILED. Appellant was permitted to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court. That status continues in this court because it has not been revoked. See Fed. R. App. P. 24(a). Even so, the full $605 in fees for this appeal will be collected when adequate funds are available in appellants prison trust account. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), (b)(2). Within 21 days, appellant must complete the enclosed authorization form and file it with this court. If appellant does not do so, the court will dismiss the appeal. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. The clerk will serve this order and a prisoner authorization form on appellant. [Entered: 03/11/2025 05:07 PM]
March 3, 2025 Filing 6 CLERK ACTION: Opening Brief submitted at DE 5 by Appellant Vinson Tremayne Johnson is filed. Original and 0 copies. [Entered: 03/03/2025 12:14 PM]
March 3, 2025 Filing 5 OPENING BRIEF submitted for filing by Appellant Vinson Tremayne Johnson. [Entered: 03/03/2025 12:13 PM]
January 27, 2025 Filing 4 ADDED Counsel for Appellee Nicholas D. Acedo [Entered: 01/27/2025 11:32 AM]
January 27, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas D. Acedo for Appellee Ryan Thornell. [Entered: 01/27/2025 10:56 AM]
January 21, 2025 Filing 2 SCHEDULE NOTICE. Appeal Opening Brief (No Transcript Due) (Appellant) 3/3/2025, Appeal Answering Brief (No Transcript Due) (Appellee) 4/3/2025. For appeal no. 25-393, 2:21-cv-00080-GMS-JZB. All briefs shall be served and filed pursuant to FRAP 31 and 9th Cir. R. 31-2.1. Failure of the petitioner(s)/appellant(s) to comply with this briefing schedule will result in automatic dismissal of the appeal. See 9th Cir. R. 42-1. [Entered: 01/21/2025 01:22 PM]
January 21, 2025 Filing 1 CASE OPENED. A copy of your notice of appeal / petition filed in 2:21-cv-00080-GMS-JZB has been received in the Clerk's office of the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. The U.S. Court of Appeals docket number 25-393 has been assigned to this case. All communications with the court must indicate this Court of Appeals docket number. Please carefully review the docket to ensure the name(s) and contact information are correct. It is your responsibility to alert the court if your contact information changes. Resources Available For more information about case processing and to assist you in preparing your brief, please review the Case Opening Information (for #attorneys and #pro se litigants) and review the #Appellate Practice Guide. Attorneys should consider contacting the court's #Appellate Mentoring Program for help with the brief and argument. [Entered: 01/21/2025 01:20 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Johnson v. Thornell, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINSON TREMAYNE JOHNSON
Represented By: Vinson Tremayne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN THORNELL, DIRECTOR OF THE ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, REHABILITATION
Represented By: Rachel Love
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Struck
Represented By: Mr. Nicholas D. Acedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID SHINN, DIRECTOR, ARIZONA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, REHABILITATION, AND REENTRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. KOPP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?