Derian Hickman v. Alderson Court Transcripts Ser, et al Featured Case
Plaintiff - Appellant: Derian Douglas Hickman
Defendant - Appellee: Alderson Court Transcripts Service For The Supreme Court, Copyright Royalty Board, United States Patent and Trademark Office, Derian Douglas Hickman Archives, District of Columbia Public Library, Office of Tax and Revenue and DC Recorder of Deeds
Case Number: 10-5212
Filed: June 24, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Patent
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2010 Filing 6 APPELLANT BRIEF and APPENDIX [1263993] filed by Mr. Derian Douglas Hickman [Service Date: 08/27/2010 ] [10-5212]
July 16, 2010 FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1255783] of order [1255769-2] to appellant [10-5212]
July 16, 2010 CERTIFIED MAIL SENT [1255782] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7007-0710-0004-7189-8832] of order [1255769-2]. Certified Mail Receipt due 08/16/2010 from Derian Douglas Hickman Archives. [10-5212]
July 16, 2010 Filing 3 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1255769] setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 09/07/2010. Appendix due 09/07/2010, Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution; The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [10-5212]
June 24, 2010 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1251672] by Mr. Derian Douglas Hickman seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:10-cv-00922-UNA. Assigned USCA Case Number [10-5212]
June 24, 2010 US CIVIL CASE docketed. [10-5212]

Search for this case: Derian Hickman v. Alderson Court Transcripts Ser, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Derian Douglas Hickman
Represented By: Derian Douglas Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Alderson Court Transcripts Service For The Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Copyright Royalty Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: United States Patent and Trademark Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Derian Douglas Hickman Archives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: District of Columbia Public Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Office of Tax and Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: DC Recorder of Deeds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?