Dick Heller, et al v. DC, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellant: Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr., William Carter and Mark Snyder
Defendant - Appellee: District of Columbia, Adrian Fenty, Mayor, District of Columbia and Cathy L. Lanier, CA-09-454
Case Number: 10-7036
Filed: April 2, 2010
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, D.C. Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
October 4, 2011 Summary Heller, et al. v. District of Columbia, et al.

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2011 MANDATE ISSUED to Clerk, District Court [10-7036]
October 5, 2011 89 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1333404] dismissing as moot motion to strike document in light of the court's October 4, 2011 opinion [1270718-3]. Before Judges: Ginsburg, Henderson and Kavanaugh. [10-7036]
October 4, 2011 88 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1333157] withholding issuance of the mandate. [10-7036]
October 4, 2011 87 Featured Case OPINION filed [1333156] (Pages: 45) for the Court by Judge Ginsburg, DISSENTING OPINION (Pages: 52) by Judge Kavanaugh [10-7036]
October 4, 2011 86 PER CURIAM JUDGMENT filed [1333154] that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in this cause is hereby affirmed in part and the case is remanded for further proceedings for the reasons in the accompanying opinion . Before Judges: Ginsburg, Henderson and Kavanaugh. [10-7036]
July 13, 2011 85 LETTER FILED [1318225] by DC and Vincent C. Gray pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 07/13/2011 ] [10-7036] (Kim, Todd)
July 11, 2011 84 LETTER FILED [1317943] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 07/11/2011 ] [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
May 12, 2011 83 LETTER FILED [1307631] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 05/12/2011 ] [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
May 11, 2011 82 LETTER FILED [1307301] by DC and Vincent C. Gray pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 05/11/2011 ] [10-7036] (Kim, Todd)
May 4, 2011 81 LETTER FILED [1306301] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 05/04/2011 ] [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
May 3, 2011 80 LETTER FILED [1306043] by DC and Vincent C. Gray pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 05/03/2011 ] [10-7036] (Kim, Todd)
March 29, 2011 79 RESPONSE TO LETTER FILED [1300518] by DC and Vincent C. Gray pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 03/29/2011 ] [10-7036]--[Edited 04/01/2011 by LMF] (Kim, Todd)
March 29, 2011 78 LETTER FILED [1300381] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 03/29/2011 ] [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
February 18, 2011 77 LETTER FILED [1293902] by DC and Vincent C. Gray pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 02/18/2011 ] [10-7036] (Kim, Todd)
January 28, 2011 76 APPELLANT SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY BRIEF [1290614] filed by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder [Service Date: 01/28/2011 ] Length of Brief: 10 pages. [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
January 25, 2011 75 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1289759], on the court's own motion, that this court's January 24, 2011 order, be amended to reflect that appellants be permitted to file a supplemental reply brief in response to the supplemental brief of amici Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, et al., not to exceed 10 pages, on or before January 28, 2011. [10-7036]
January 24, 2011 PER ABOVE ORDER the lodged Amicus supplemental brief [1288391-2] is filed [10-7036]
January 24, 2011 73 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1289631] granting the motion of amici curiae Brady Center, et al. for leave to file a supplemental brief [1288247-2]; The Clerk is directed to file the lodged brief [1288391-2], It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellants' alternative motion for leave to file a separate reply brief be granted. The Clerk is directed to file Appellant's supplemental reply brief [1289311-2] Before Judges: Ginsburg, Henderson and Kavanaugh. [10-7036]
January 21, 2011 72 APPELLANT SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY BRIEF [1289311] filed by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder [Service Date: 01/21/2011 ] Length of Brief: 10 pages. [10-7036]--[Edited 01/24/2011 by MCM] (Gardiner, Richard)
January 18, 2011 71 MODIFIED EVENT FROM FILED TO LODGED--CORRECTED AMICUS FOR APPELLEE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF [1288391] filed by The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence [Service Date: 01/18/2011 ] Length of Brief: 10 Pages. [10-7036]--[Edited 01/19/2011 by LMF] (Wolfson, Paul)
January 18, 2011 70 LETTER FILED [1288316] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder requesting Clerk to bring to the panel's attention as expeditiously as possible Appellants' Opposition To Brady Center's Motion For Leave To File Supplemental Brief Amicus Curiae because Appellants' Reply is due on 1/21/11.. [Service Date: 01/18/2011 ] [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
January 18, 2011 69 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1288312] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder to motion for leave to file [1288247-2] [Service Date: 01/18/2011 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
January 14, 2011 68 MOTION filed [1288247] by The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence for leave to file brief (Response to Motion served by mail due on 01/27/2011) [Service Date: 01/14/2011 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [10-7036] (Wolfson, Paul)
January 12, 2011 67 APPELLEE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF [1287622] filed by DC and Vincent C. Gray [Service Date: 01/12/2011 ] Length of Brief: 20 pages. [10-7036] (Kim, Todd)
January 7, 2011 66 AMICUS BRIEF [1286918] filed by USA (at the invitation of the Court) [Service Date: 01/07/2011 ] [10-7036]--[Edited 01/07/2011 by LMC] (Smith, Peter)
January 7, 2011 65 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1286912] by Peter S. Smith on behalf of USA. [10-7036] (Smith, Peter)
January 5, 2011 64 LETTER FILED [1286299] by DC and Vincent C. Gray pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 01/05/2011 ] [10-7036] (Kim, Todd)
January 4, 2011 63 LETTER FILED [1286080] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 01/04/2011 ] [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
December 22, 2010 62 LETTER FILED [1284430] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 12/22/2010 ] [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
December 22, 2010 61 APPELLANT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF [1284429] filed by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder [Service Date: 12/22/2010 ] Length of Brief: 20 pages. [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
December 20, 2010 60 LETTER FILED [1283806] by DC and Adrian Fenty pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 12/20/2010 ] [10-7036] (Kim, Todd)
November 24, 2010 59 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1279550] granting the motion of the parties and the United States for modification of the supplemental briefing schedule; [1278439-2] Revising supplemental briefing schedule to the following extent: APPELLANTS' Supplemental Brief due 12/22/2010. APPELLEES' Supplemental Brief due on 01/12/2011. APPELLANTS' Reply Brief due 01/21/2011; The brief of the United States may be filed on or before January 7, 2011. Before Judges: Ginsburg, Henderson and Kavanaugh. [10-7036]
November 23, 2010 TRANSCRIPT [1279402] of oral argument [10-7036]
November 19, 2010 57 JOINT MOTION filed [1278439] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr., Mark Snyder and DC, Adrian Fenty and Cathy L. Lanier Modification of Supplemental Briefing Schedule (Joint Motion of the Parties and the United States). [Service Date: 11/19/2010 ] Pages: 1-10. [10-7036] (Kolb, Chrisellen)
November 16, 2010 56 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1277816] directing the parties to file supplemental briefs address four specific questions (see order for details of questions); The following format will apply: Supplemental brief for appellants (not to exceed 20 pages) due 12/01/2010; Supplemental brief for appellees (not to exceed 20 pages) due 12/08/2010; Reply brief for appellants (not to exceed 10 pages) due 12/13/2010. The United States is invited to file a brief, not to exceed 20 pages, on any or all of these questions by Friday, 12/03/2010. In addition to electronic filing, the parties are directed to deliver paper copies to the court on the date due. Before Judges: Ginsburg, Henderson and Kavanaugh. [10-7036]
November 15, 2010 55 ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Ginsburg, Henderson and Kavanaugh. [10-7036]
November 10, 2010 FORM 72 submitted by on behalf of Appellants William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller and Absalom F. Jordan, Jr.. Arguing Person Information Updated for: Stephen Porter Halbrook [10-7036]
November 2, 2010 FORM 72 submitted by arguing attorney, Todd Sunhwae Kim, on behalf of Appellees DC and Adrian Fenty. [10-7036] (Kim, Todd)
November 2, 2010 52 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1275074] allocating oral argument time as follows: Appellants -- 15 Minutes, Appellees -- 15 Minutes. One counsel per side to argue; directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney - due 11/10/2010 [10-7036]
November 1, 2010 51 LETTER FILED [1274735] by DC and Adrian Fenty pursuant to FRAP 28j advising of additional authorities [Service Date: 11/01/2010 ] [10-7036] (Kim, Todd)
October 29, 2010 50 REPLY FILED [1274580] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder to response [Service Date: 10/29/2010 by CM/ECF NDA, US Mail] Pages: 11-15. [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
October 29, 2010 49 PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1274493] deferring consideration of appellants' motion to strike [1270718-3] pending the oral argument of this case on November 15, 2010. Before Judges: Ginsburg, Henderson and Kavanaugh. [10-7036]
October 21, 2010 48 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FILED [1273115] by DC and Adrian Fenty to motion to strike document [1270718-3] [Service Date: 10/21/2010 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 21-30. [10-7036] (Kim, Todd)
October 19, 2010 PER ABOVE ORDER lodged appendix [1267832-2] is filed [10-7036]
October 19, 2010 46 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1272264] granting motion for leave to file [1267769-2]; The Clerk is directed to file appendix [1267832-2] [10-7036]
October 18, 2010 45 CORRECTED APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1272238] filed by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder [Service Date: 10/18/2010 ] Length of Brief: 6,846. [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
October 18, 2010 44 INCORRECT DOCKET ENTRY-DISREGARD--APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1271969] filed by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder [Service Date: 10/18/2010 ] Length of Brief: 6,995 words. [10-7036]--[Edited 10/19/2010 by JMC] (Gardiner, Richard)
October 8, 2010 43 MOTION filed [1270718] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder To Strike References To A Video In Appellees' Brief And To Strike A Portion Of Appellees' Statutory Addendum And References Thereto In Appellees' Brief. (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/21/2010) [Service Date: 10/08/2010 by US Mail, CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 16-20. [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
October 8, 2010 42 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1270576] scheduling oral argument before Judges GINSBURG, HENDERSON, KAVANAUGH 11/15/2010 AM [10-7036]
September 29, 2010 41 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1268704] granting appellant's motion to extend time to file reply brief [1268428-2]; [1248731-2] APPELLANT Reply Brief now due 10/18/2010 [10-7036]
September 27, 2010 40 MOTION filed [1268428] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder to extend time to file reply to 10/18/2010 at 11:59 pm. [Service Date: 09/27/2010 ] Pages: 1-10. [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
September 24, 2010 39 APPENDIX [1267832] lodged by Professional Historians and Law Professors [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 09/23/2010 ] [10-7036] (Shors, Matthew)
September 23, 2010 38 MOTION filed [1267769] by Professional Historians and Law Professors for leave to file appendix (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/07/2010) [Service Date: 09/23/2010 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: Exceeds Limits. [10-7036] (Shors, Matthew)
September 21, 2010 37 SUPPLEMENT [1266983] to Amicus final brief [1266982-2] filed by Professional Historians and Law Professors [Service Date: 09/20/2010 ] [10-7036] (Shors, Matthew)
September 20, 2010 36 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE FINAL BRIEF [1266982] filed by Professional Historians and Law Professors [Service Date: 09/20/2010 ] Length of Brief: 6269 words. [10-7036] (Shors, Matthew)
September 20, 2010 35 AMICUS FOR APPELLEE BRIEF [1266943] filed by The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence [Service Date: 09/20/2010 ] Length of Brief: 6972 Words. [10-7036] (Wolfson, Paul)
September 17, 2010 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1266638] to motion to substitute party or change name [1266637-2] filed by The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. [10-7036] (Wolfson, Paul)
September 17, 2010 33 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1266637] by The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence to substitute party Hispanic American Police Command Officers Association, International Brotherhood of Police Officers, and National Black Police Association for Legal Community Against Violence (Response to Motion served by mail due on 09/30/2010) [Service Date: 09/17/2010 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [10-7036] (Wolfson, Paul)
September 3, 2010 32 SEPARATE STATUTORY ADDENDUM FILED [1264076] by DC and Adrian Fenty to Appellee/Respondent brief [1264075-2] [Service Date:09/03/2010 ] [10-7036] (Kim, Todd)
September 3, 2010 31 APPELLEE BRIEF [1264075] filed by DC and Adrian Fenty [Service Date: 09/03/2010 ] Length of Brief: 14,000 words. [10-7036] (Kim, Todd)
August 11, 2010 30 CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF [1260137] filed by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder [Service Date: 08/11/2010 ] Length of Brief: 13,331. [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
August 4, 2010 29 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1258889] granting appellees' motion for leave to file statutory addendum including legislative history; [1258777-2]; Granting appellees' motion to extend time [1258776-2]; Revising briefing schedule as follows: [1251211-2] APPELLEE Brief due on 09/03/2010. AMICUS for APPELLEE Brief due 09/20/2010. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 10/04/2010 [10-7036]
August 3, 2010 28 MODIFIED DOCKET TEXT--MOTION filed [1258777] by DC and Adrian Fenty for leave to file addendum with legislative history [Service Date: 08/03/2010 ] Pages: 1-10. [10-7036]--[Edited 08/03/2010 by MAL] (Kim, Todd)
August 3, 2010 27 MOTION filed [1258776] by DC and Adrian Fenty to extend time to file brief to 09/03/2010. [Service Date: 08/03/2010 ] Pages: 1-10. [10-7036] (Kim, Todd)
July 30, 2010 26 AMICUS FOR APPELLANT BRIEF [1258315] filed by Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, Gun Owners Foundation, Gun Owners of America, Inc., Gun Owners of California, Inc., Lincoln Institute for Research and Education, Maryland Shall Issue, Inc. and Virginia Citizens Defense League [Service Date: 07/30/2010 ] Length of Brief: 6,942 Words. [10-7036] (Olson, William)
July 27, 2010 25 APPENDIX [1257646] filed [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 07/23/2010 ] [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
July 23, 2010 24 APPELLANT BRIEF [1256915] filed by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder [Service Date: 07/23/2010 ] Length of Brief: 13,331. [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
June 22, 2010 23 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1251211] granting motion of Gun Owners of America, et al., to participate as amicus curiae [1249049-2], setting briefing schedule: AMICUS for APPELLANT Brief due 07/30/2010 [10-7036]
June 9, 2010 22 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--UNOPPOSED MOTION filed [1249049] by Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al. for leave to late file notice to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Previously Filed] [Service Date: 06/09/2010 ] [10-7036]--[Edited 06/10/2010 by JMC] (Olson, William)
June 9, 2010 21 NOTICE lodged [1249046] by Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al. of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 06/09/2010 ] [10-7036] (Olson, William)
June 8, 2010 20 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1248731] setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 07/23/2010. Appendix due 07/23/2010. APPELLEE Brief due on 08/23/2010. AMICUS for APPELLEE Brief due 09/07/2010. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 09/21/2010 [10-7036]
June 2, 2010 19 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--UNOPPOSED NOTICE filed [1247810] by Professional Historians and Law Professors of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Not Applicable to this Party] [Service Date: 06/02/2010 ] [10-7036]--[Edited 06/03/2010 by JMC] (Shors, Matthew)
June 1, 2010 18 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1247416] by Paul R.Q. Wolfson and co-counsel A. Stephen Hut on behalf of Amici Curiae for Appellee Legal Community Against Violence and The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. [10-7036] (Wolfson, Paul)
June 1, 2010 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1247325] to notice to participate as amicus curiae [1247244-2] filed by Legal Community Against Violence and The Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. [10-7036] (Wolfson, Paul)
May 31, 2010 16 MODIFIED PARTY FILER--JOINT NOTICE filed [1247244] by Brady Center To Prevent Gun Violence and Legal Community Against Violence of intention to participate as amicus curiae. [Disclosure Listing: Attached] [Service Date: 05/31/2010 ] [10-7036]--[Edited 06/01/2010 by JMC] (Wolfson, Paul)
May 3, 2010 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1242839] to certificate [1242832-2], notice [1242830-2] filed by DC and Adrian Fenty. [10-7036] (Kim, Todd)
May 3, 2010 14 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1242832] by DC and Adrian Fenty [Service Date: 05/03/2010 ] [10-7036] (Kim, Todd)
May 3, 2010 13 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1242830] by Todd S. Kim and co-counsel Donna M. Murasky on behalf of Appellees DC and Adrian Fenty. [10-7036] (Kim, Todd)
April 23, 2010 12 STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1241363] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder [Service Date: 04/23/2010 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
April 22, 2010 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1241260] to notice [1241251-2], report status of transcript (final) [1241256-2], statement [1241248-2] filed by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder. [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
April 22, 2010 10 Featured Case UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1241258] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder [Service Date: 04/22/2010 ] [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
April 22, 2010 9 TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1241256] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder [Service Date: 04/22/2010 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
April 22, 2010 8 STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1241254] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder [Service Date: 04/22/2010 ] [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
April 22, 2010 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1241251] by Stephen P. Halbrook and co-counsel Richard E. Gardiner on behalf of Appellants William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder. [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
April 22, 2010 6 DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1241248] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder [Service Date: 04/22/2010 ] [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
April 22, 2010 5 CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1241244] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder [Service Date: 04/22/2010 ] [10-7036] (Gardiner, Richard)
April 5, 2010 FIRST CLASS MAIL [1238699] RETURNED marked "Forward time exp, rtn to send". Mail had been sent to Appellants's attorney Stephen Halbrook. [10-7036]
April 2, 2010 3 CLERK'S ORDER filed [1237905] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/03/2010. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 05/03/2010. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/03/2010. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/03/2010. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/03/2010. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 05/03/2010. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/03/2010. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/03/2010. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 05/17/2010; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 05/03/2010. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/03/2010. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/03/2010. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 05/17/2010 [10-7036]
April 2, 2010 2 NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1237899] by William Carter, Dick Anthony Heller, Absalom F. Jordan, Jr. and Mark Snyder seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:08-cv-01289-RMU. Assigned USCA Case Number [10-7036]
April 2, 2010 PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [10-7036]

Search for this case: Dick Heller, et al v. DC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Dick Anthony Heller
Represented By: Stephen Porter Halbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Absalom F. Jordan, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen Porter Halbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: William Carter
Represented By: Richard E. Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Mark Snyder
Represented By: Richard E. Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: District of Columbia
Represented By: Donna M. Murasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Adrian Fenty, Mayor, District of Columbia
Represented By: Donna M. Murasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Cathy L. Lanier, CA-09-454
Represented By: Donna M. Murasky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?